EP0577741 - Separable connecting device for steering column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/02] | SEPARABLE CONNECTING DEVICE FOR STEERING COLUMN | ||
[1995/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TORRINGTON COMPANY 59 Field Street Torrington Connecticut 06790 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states THE TORRINGTON COMPANY 59 Field Street Torrington, Connecticut 06790 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFFY, Paul, E. 26 Bridle Drive Winsted, CT 06098 / US | 02 /
HANSEN, John 17 Pelham Road West Hartford, CT 06107 / US | 03 /
LUGOSI, Robert 9 Town Bridge Road, Box 568 Canton, CT 06019 / US | 04 /
GUPTILL, Spencer 17 Canterbury Court New Milford, CT 06776 / US | 05 /
KACKOWSKI, Matthew 15 Settlers Lane Torrington, CT 06790 / US | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Lehmann, Klaus, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Lehmann, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schroeter, Fleuchaus, Lehmann, Wehser, Holzer & Gallo, Patentanwälte, Postfach 71 03 50 D-81453 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92910128.5 | 31.03.1992 | [1994/02] | WO1992US02526 | Priority number, date | US19910680162 | 03.04.1991 Original published format: US 680162 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217362 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577741 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577741 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/19 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
B62D1/192 (EP,US);
F16B2200/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/02] | Title | German: | Trennbare Verbindungsvorrichtung für Lenksäule | [1994/02] | English: | Separable connecting device for steering column | [1995/18] | French: | Dispositif de connexion separable pour colonne de direction | [1995/18] |
Former [1994/02] | SEPARABLE CONNECTING DEVICE FOR STEERING COLUMN | ||
Former [1994/02] | DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION SEPARABLE POUR COLONNE DE DIRECTION | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 30.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1927173 (AUDI AG); | [X]FR2118275 (PEUGEOT & RENAULT); | [X]US4156372 (WENNINGER JOSEF [DE]); | [X]EP0203845 (NACAM [FR]) |