EP0531515 - Displaying n dimensional seismic data in an n-1 dimensional format [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/11] | DISPLAYING N DIMENSIONAL DATA IN AN N-1 DIMENSIONAL FORMAT | ||
[1995/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exxon Production Research Company P.O. Box 2189, 3120 Buffalo Speedway Houston Texas 77252 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states EXXON PRODUCTION RESEARCH COMPANY P.O. Box 2189, 3120 Buffalo Speedway Houston, Texas 77252 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARK, Tracy, J. 11910 Riverview Way Houston, TX 77077 / US | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | ||
Former [1993/11] | Mitchell, Alan ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92910143.4 | 24.03.1992 | [1993/11] | WO1992US02390 | Priority number, date | US19910675690 | 27.03.1991 Original published format: US 675690 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217798 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531515 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531515 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/34 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
G06T17/05 (EP,US);
G01V1/34 (EP,US);
G09B29/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/11] | Title | German: | Darstellung von n-dimensionalen seismischen Daten in einem n-1 dimensionalen Format | [1995/34] | English: | Displaying n dimensional seismic data in an n-1 dimensional format | [1995/34] | French: | Affichage de données sismiques à n dimensions dans un format à n-1 dimensions | [1995/34] |
Former [1993/11] | ANZEIGEVERFAHREN FÜR N-DIMENSIONALE DATEN IN EINEM N-1 DIMENSIONALEN FORMAT | ||
Former [1993/11] | DISPLAYING N DIMENSIONAL DATA IN AN N-1 DIMENSIONAL FORMAT | ||
Former [1993/11] | AFFICHAGE DE DONNEES A N DIMENSIONS DANS UN FORMAT A N-1 DIMENSIONS | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4228529 (HSU I-CHI, et al); | [A]US5001677 (MASTERS A RONALD [US]); | [A]US4063216 (CHAPMAN LLOYD RUSSELL, et al); | [A]US3668618 (QUAY ROY G) | [X] - GEOPHYSICS. vol. 37, no. 5, October 1972, TULSA US pages 825 - 838; R. B. SMITH ET AL.: 'Computer graphics in geophysics' cited in the application | [A] - GEOPHYSICS. vol. 36, no. 6, December 1971, TULSA US pages 1043 - 1073; W. A. SCHNEIDER: 'Developments in seismic data processing and analysis(1968-1970)' cited in the application |