EP0589909 - A METHOD OF STRENGTHENING GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF SHEFFIELD Western Bank Sheffield, South Yorkshire S10 2TN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIS, Bryan 41 Stephen Drive Crosspol Sheffield S10 5NX / GB | 02 /
CHEN, Xiao, Ming 8 Benbow Road Thetford, Norfolk IP24 2TN / GB | 03 /
SEDDON, Angela, Beth 47 Alms Hill Road Sheffield S11 9RR / GB | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Neville, Peter Warwick, et al Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Neville, Peter Warwick, et al Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1994/14] | Gaunt, Robert John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92910333.1 | 20.05.1992 | [1994/14] | WO1992GB00913 | Priority number, date | GB19910011261 | 24.05.1991 Original published format: GB 9111261 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9220633 | Date: | 26.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589909 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589909 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/32, C03C17/30 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
C03C17/32 (EP,US);
C03C17/30 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C08F290/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verstärkung von Glas | [1994/14] | English: | A METHOD OF STRENGTHENING GLASS | [1994/14] | French: | METHODE DE RENFORCEMENT DU VERRE | [1994/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   14.01.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2269780 ; | [A]US4250068 (ALI-ZAIDI SYED R [US]); | [A]EP0250779 (BOUVET VERNIS SOC [FR]); | [A]EP0289325 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al) | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST, Accession no. 90-372481, Week 50, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP,A, 2269780 (KANSAI PAINT KK) 05 November 1990, see abstract, & JP2269780 A 19901105 | Examination | - WPIL, Week 50, Derwent Publications Ltd., London (GB); AN 90-372481 |