EP0576613 - PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 2-CHLORO-1,1,1-TRIFLUOROETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORBIN, David, Richard 835 Lenape Road West Chester, PA 19382 / US | 02 /
RAO, Velliyur, Nott, Mallikarjuna 1 Georgetown Avenue Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92910813.2 | 19.03.1992 | [1994/01] | WO1992US02069 | Priority number, date | US19910672875 | 20.03.1991 Original published format: US 672875 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216480 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576613 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576613 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/00, C07C19/08 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
C07C17/087 (EP,US);
B01J23/06 (EP,US);
B01J27/12 (EP,US);
B01J27/125 (EP,US);
C07C17/21 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/087, C07C19/12 (EP,US);
C07C17/21, C07C19/12 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1994/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-CHLOR-1,1,1-TRIFLUORETHAN | [1994/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 2-CHLORO-1,1,1-TRIFLUOROETHANE | [1994/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE 2-CHLORO-1,1,1-TRIFLUOROETHANE | [1994/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/07] | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0282005 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0298662 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0407961 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |