EP0589918 - MODIFIER FOR THE FRICTION COEFFICIENT OF RUBBER COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/14] | RUBBER COMPOUNDS | ||
[1997/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNILEVER AUSTRALIA LIMITED 164 Ingles Street Port Melbourne, VIC 3207 / AU | [1994/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLSWORTH, Ernest, Gordon 8 Old Belair Road Mitcham, S.A. 5062 / AU | 02 /
HAYES, Michael, H., B. Lake Hall of Residence University of Birmingham Birmingham B15 2TT / GB | 03 /
TAYLOR, Reginald, Morton 48 Denning Street Hawthorn, S.A. 5062 / AU | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | van Gent, Jan Paulus, et al Unilever N.V., Patent Division Postbus 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | van Gent, Jan Paulus, et al Unilever N.V., Patent Division Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1994/14] | Hartong, Richard Leroy Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 92910990.8 | 27.05.1992 | [1994/14] | WO1992AU00240 | Priority number, date | AU19910006351 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: AU 635191 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9221717 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589918 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589918 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/05, C08L21/00 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
C08K5/0091 (EP);
C08K5/057 (EP);
C08L21/00 (EP);
C08L71/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08K5/0091, C08K5/057, C08L71/10 (EP);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08K5/0091, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/057, C08L21/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [1994/14] | C08K5/05, C08L7/00, C08L21/00, C08J3/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | MODIFIKATOR FÜR DEN REIBUNGSKOEFFIZIENT EINER KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNG | [1997/03] | English: | MODIFIER FOR THE FRICTION COEFFICIENT OF RUBBER COMPOUNDS | [1997/03] | French: | MODIFICATEUR POUR LE COEFFICIENT DE FRICTION DES MELANGES DE CAOUTCHOUC | [1997/03] |
Former [1994/14] | KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNG | ||
Former [1994/14] | RUBBER COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [1994/14] | MELANGES DE CAOUTCHOUC | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.1994 | Search fee paid | 24.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.01.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   26.01.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.01.1997 | BE | 15.01.1997 | CH | 15.01.1997 | DK | 15.01.1997 | ES | 15.01.1997 | FR | 15.01.1997 | GR | 15.01.1997 | IT | 15.01.1997 | LI | 15.01.1997 | NL | 15.01.1997 | SE | 15.04.1997 | DE | 16.04.1997 | GB | 27.05.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
BE | 15.01.1997 | ||
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
DK | 15.01.1997 | ||
ES | 15.01.1997 | ||
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
NL | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
GB | 27.05.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
BE | 15.01.1997 | ||
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
DK | 15.01.1997 | ||
ES | 15.01.1997 | ||
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
GB | 27.05.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
BE | 15.01.1997 | ||
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
DK | 15.01.1997 | ||
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
GB | 27.05.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
BE | 15.01.1997 | ||
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
DK | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
GB | 27.05.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
BE | 15.01.1997 | ||
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
DK | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
GB | 27.05.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
BE | 15.01.1997 | ||
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
BE | 15.01.1997 | ||
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
BE | 15.01.1997 | ||
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/43] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
DE | 16.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 15.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YA]JP54003147 ; | [YA]JP61275156 ; | [YA]JP01022659 ; | [YA]SU187996 ; | [A]FR2041331 ; | [A]DE1794079 (ETHYLENE PLASTIQUE SA); | [A]FR2206347 (PERSTORP AB [SE]); | [X]AU6287286 (GLYZINC PHARMA LTD); | [X]WO8909758 (HALLSWORTH ERNEST GORDON [AU], et al) | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, C39, page 116; & JP,A,54 003 147 (NIPPON GOSEI GOMU K.K.) 1 November 1979 (01.11.79)., & JP54003147 A 19791101 | [YA] - DERWENT ABSTRACTS Accession No. 86-222015/34, Class Q35; & JP,A,61 275 156 (BANDO CHEM. IND.) 11 July 1986 (11.07.86)., & JP61275156 A 19860711 | [YA] - DERWENT ABSTRACTS Accession No. 90-287177/38, Class A12 E12; & JP,A,01 022 659 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE K.K.) 13 August 1990 (13.08.90)., & JP01022659 A 19900813 | [YA] - Derwent Soviet Inventions Illustrated, Year 67, Month 6, Class I, Plastics, Metal Finishing page 7; & SU,A,187996 (RUBBER IND. RES. INST.) 10 December 1966 (10.12.66)., & SU187996 A 00000000 |