EP0583352 - hGPIIb FRAGMENTS AND THEIR USE IN $i(IN VITRO) METHODS FOR DETERMINING $i(IN VIVO) THROMBOTIC EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/08] | $i(IN VITRO) METHODS FOR DETERMINING $i(IN VIVO) THROMBOTIC EVENTS | ||
[1998/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 10666 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1994/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GINSBERG, Mark, H. 2944 Renault Place San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
FRELINGER, Andrew, L., III 7 Westward Circle North Reading, MA 01864 / US | 03 /
PLOW, Edward, F. 4359 Rous Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Fisher, Adrian John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92911047.6 | 27.04.1992 | [1994/08] | WO1992US03419 | Priority number, date | US19910693388 | 30.04.1991 Original published format: US 693388 | [1994/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219760 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583352 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0583352 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K14/705, C12Q1/00, G01N33/53 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C07K16/2848 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
Y10S436/808 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/24] | C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K7/10, C12Q1/00, G01N33/53 | ||
Former IPC [1994/08] | C12Q1/00, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/08] | Title | German: | hGPIIb-FRAGMENTE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN IN-VITRO-VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON IN VIVO STATTFINDENDEN THROMBOTISCHEN EREIGNISSEN | [1998/47] | English: | hGPIIb FRAGMENTS AND THEIR USE IN $i(IN VITRO) METHODS FOR DETERMINING $i(IN VIVO) THROMBOTIC EVENTS | [1998/47] | French: | FRAGMENTS DE hGPIIb ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER $i(IN VITRO) DES EVENEMENTS THROMBOTIQUES $i(IN VIVO) | [1998/47] |
Former [1994/08] | IN-VITRO-VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON IN VIVO STATTFINDENDEN THROMBOTISCHEN EREIGNISSEN | ||
Former [1994/08] | $i(IN VITRO) METHODS FOR DETERMINING $i(IN VIVO) THROMBOTIC EVENTS | ||
Former [1994/08] | PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER $i(IN VITRO) DES EVENEMENTS THROMBOTIQUES $i(IN VIVO) | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 16.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8900200 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]) [X] 1-26 * page 11, line 21 - line 32; example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO9108306 (BLOOD CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN W [US]) [PX] 1 * page 14; claims 29-34 *; | [PA]WO9107977 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]) [PA] 1-26* example -; claim - * | International search | [XY] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., USA, Vol. 84, issued October 1987, J.C. LOFTUS et al., "Molecular cloning and chemical synthesis of a region of platelet glycoprotein IIb involved in adhesive function", pages 7114-7118, see entire document, especially Fig. 3, residues 40-140 and page 7116. | [XY] - Eur. J. Biochem., Vol. 171, issued 1988, G. UZAN et al., "cDNA clones for human platelet GPIIb corresponding to mRNA from megakaryocytes and HEL cells", pages 87-93, see entire document, especially Fig. 4, residues 296-496 and particularly residues 468-496. |