EP0588836 - GLASS-FIBRE-REINFORCED PLASTIC CONTAINER, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPOSITE SCANDINAVIA AB Box 276 S-941 26 Pitea / SE | [1994/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGLUND, Kurt Harrbäcken 1731 S-940 21 Norrfjärden / SE | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 92911072.4 | 22.05.1992 | [1994/13] | WO1992SE00347 | Priority number, date | SE19910001584 | 24.05.1991 Original published format: SE 9101584 | [1994/13] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9220954 | Date: | 26.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588836 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588836 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/16, B29C70/22, F16J12/00 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
F17C1/06 (EP,US);
B29C65/5014 (EP,US);
B29C65/5021 (EP,US);
B29C65/5042 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/1162 (EP,US);
B29C66/1224 (EP,US);
B29C66/1226 (EP,US);
B29C66/14 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C70/207 (EP,US);
F16J12/00 (EP,US);
F17C1/16 (EP,US);
B29C65/483 (EP,US);
B29C65/4845 (EP,US);
B29K2105/06 (EP,US);
B29K2309/08 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7156 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2201/032 (EP,US);
F17C2201/056 (EP,US);
F17C2203/011 (EP,US);
F17C2203/013 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0333 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0345 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0621 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0663 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0665 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0668 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0673 (EP,US);
F17C2209/2109 (EP,US);
F17C2209/2118 (EP,US);
F17C2209/2154 (EP,US);
F17C2209/221 (EP,US);
F17C2209/225 (EP,US);
F17C2209/227 (EP,US);
F17C2209/232 (EP,US);
F17C2221/018 (EP,US);
F17C2221/031 (EP,US);
F17C2221/035 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/035 (EP,US);
F17C2260/011 (EP,US);
F17C2260/013 (EP,US);
F17C2260/042 (EP,US);
F17C2270/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP);
B29C66/723, B29C65/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1994/13] | F17C1/16, B29C67/14, // F16J12/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | GLASFASERVERSTÄRKTE KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER, VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCHER BEHÄLTER | [1994/13] | English: | GLASS-FIBRE-REINFORCED PLASTIC CONTAINER, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH CONTAINER | [1994/13] | French: | RESERVOIR EN PLASTIQUE RENFORCE PAR FIBRES DE VERRE; PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DUDIT RESERVOIR | [1994/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1992 | Translation filed | 23.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 02.08.1995 | SE | 02.11.1995 | [2001/24] |
Former [1996/14] | SE | 02.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1055915 (JAMES JOSEPH HIDY [US]); | [A]US1084116 (SLICK EDWIN E [US], et al); | [A]US3112234 (KRUPP CARROLL P); | [A]US3492186 (YOUNG JOHN A); | [A]EP0193380 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0264550 (NI IND INC [US]); | [A]EP0270411 (BROCHIER SA [FR]); | [A]WO9118239 (KB KOMPOSIT FOERSAELJNINGS AB [SE]) |