EP0591248 - DISPOSABLE DIAPERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Becker, Maria Patentanwältin, Auf dem Haigst 29 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Becker, Maria, Dipl.-Phys. Auf dem Haigst 29 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92911090.6 | 09.06.1992 | [1994/15] | WO1992DE00486 | Priority number, date | DE19914121419 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4121419 | [1994/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300059 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591248 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591248 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
A61F13/84 (EP);
A61F2013/425 (EP);
A61F2013/49031 (EP);
A61F2013/49076 (EP);
A61F2013/4966 (EP);
A61F2013/51409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/44] |
Former [1995/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [1994/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | WEGWERFWINDEL | [1994/15] | English: | DISPOSABLE DIAPERS | [1994/15] | French: | COUCHE A JETER | [1994/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 30.08.1995 | [2003/18] |
Former [2001/24] | MC | 30.08.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0109126 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]US4735622 (ACUFF ANDILA C [US], et al); | [XP]EP0454105 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0376022 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |