EP0587641 - TDMA COMMUNICATION USING CARRIER FREQUENCY OFFSET COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1994/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LING, Fuyun 202 Chestnut Avenue Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US | 02 /
LABEDZ, Gerald, P. 7406 N. Talman Chicago, IL 60645 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1994/12] | Hudson, Peter David MOTOROLA European Intellectual Property Operations Jays Close Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke Hants RG22 4PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92911134.2 | 29.04.1992 | [1994/12] | WO1992US03552 | Priority number, date | US19910709004 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: US 709004 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222155 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587641 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587641 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04B7/26, H04L25/03 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
H04L27/2332 (EP,US);
H04L2027/003 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0057 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0067 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0095 (EP,US);
H04L25/0212 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/22] | H04J3/06, H04B7/26 | ||
Former IPC [1994/12] | H04J3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/12] | Title | German: | TDMA-KOMMUNIKATION MIT KOMPENSATION DER TRÄGERVERSCHIEBUNG | [1994/12] | English: | TDMA COMMUNICATION USING CARRIER FREQUENCY OFFSET COMPENSATION | [1994/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE COMPENSER LE DECALAGE DES FREQUENCES PORTEUSES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION A ACCES MULTIPLE A REPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS (AMRT) | [1994/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1993 | Search fee paid | 28.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 28.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.08.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/36] | FR | 15.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US4847869 (LABEDZ GERALD P [US], et al); | [Y]US4873683 (BORTH DAVID E [US], et al); | [A]US4324001 (RHODES SMITH A); | [A]US5007068 (SIMON MARVIN K [US], et al); | [AP]US5097220 (SHIMAKATA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) | [A] - GOTTFRIED UNGERBOECK, "Adaptive Maximum-Likelihood Receiver for Carrier-Modulated Data-Transmission Systems", IEEE Transactions on Communications, Vol. COM-22 (No. 5): 624-636, May 1974. |