EP0588854 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECLAIMING WASTE OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PATENT HOLDINGS LTD. P.O.Box 156 Hibiscus Square Pond Street Grand Turk Turks & Caicos Islands / TC | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states PATENT HOLDINGS LTD. P.O.Box 156 Hibiscus Square Pond Street Grand Turk Turks & Caicos Islands / TC | ||
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states SHURTLEFF, Edward Calton Utopia Fabricating, R.R., No.1 St. George, New Brunswick EOG 2LO / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shurtleff, Edward Calton Utopia Fabricating, R.R., No. 1 St. George, New Brunswick E0G 2L0 / CA | [1995/17] |
Former [1994/13] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1994/13] | Chettle, Adrian John Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92911511.1 | 10.06.1992 | [1994/13] | WO1992CA00241 | Priority number, date | US19910712761 | 10.06.1991 Original published format: US 712761 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222625 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588854 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588854 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C10M175/00 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
B01D1/0058 (EP,US);
B01D3/42 (EP,US);
C10M175/0025 (EP,US);
Y10T137/742 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG VON GEBRAUCHTEN OELEN | [1994/13] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECLAIMING WASTE OIL | [1994/13] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION D'HUILE USAGEE | [1994/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.1995 | BE | 26.04.1995 | CH | 26.04.1995 | DK | 26.04.1995 | ES | 26.04.1995 | FR | 26.04.1995 | GR | 26.04.1995 | IT | 26.04.1995 | LI | 26.04.1995 | MC | 26.04.1995 | NL | 26.04.1995 | LU | 30.06.1995 | SE | 26.07.1995 | DE | 27.07.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/18] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
DK | 26.04.1995 | ||
ES | 26.04.1995 | ||
GR | 26.04.1995 | ||
IT | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
MC | 26.04.1995 | ||
NL | 26.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
DK | 26.04.1995 | ||
ES | 26.04.1995 | ||
GR | 26.04.1995 | ||
IT | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
NL | 26.04.1995 | ||
MC | 10.06.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
DK | 26.04.1995 | ||
ES | 26.04.1995 | ||
GR | 26.04.1995 | ||
IT | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
MC | 26.04.1995 | ||
NL | 26.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
DK | 26.04.1995 | ||
ES | 26.04.1995 | ||
GR | 26.04.1995 | ||
IT | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
MC | 26.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
DK | 26.04.1995 | ||
GR | 26.04.1995 | ||
IT | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
MC | 26.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
DK | 26.04.1995 | ||
GR | 26.04.1995 | ||
IT | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
DK | 26.04.1995 | ||
IT | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
DK | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
BE | 26.04.1995 | ||
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.07.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 26.04.1995 | |
CH | 26.04.1995 | ||
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | CH | 26.04.1995 | |
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | CH | 26.04.1995 | |
LI | 26.04.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | CH | 26.04.1995 | |
LI | 26.04.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3121246 (DRESPA GERD [DE]); | [X]EP0360500 (SHURTLEFF EDWARD C) |