EP0641315 - SELECTIVE LOW PRESSURE HYDROGENATION OF A DINITRILE TO AN AMINONITRILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIEMECKI, Stanislaw, Bogdan 113 Prospect Drive Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92912027.7 | 27.05.1992 | [1995/10] | WO1992US04193 | Priority number, date | US19910708945 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: US 708945 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9221650 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641315 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641315 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/24, C07C253/30 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
C07C255/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/10] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE NIEDERDRUCK-HYDROGENIERUNG EINES DINITRILS ZU EINEM AMINONITRIL | [1995/10] | English: | SELECTIVE LOW PRESSURE HYDROGENATION OF A DINITRILE TO AN AMINONITRILE | [1995/10] | French: | HYDROGENATION SELECTIVE A BASSE PRESSION D'UN DINITRILE, AFIN D'OBTENIR UN AMINONITRILE | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 01.12.1993 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2257814 (WAYNE RIGBY GEORGE); | [A]US2762835 (JACK SWERDLOFF); | [A]BE681932 |