EP0584235 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A SELF WOUND PRESSURE SENSITIVE LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/09] | SELF WOUND PRESSURE SENSITIVE LABEL | ||
[1995/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morgan Adhesive Company 4560 Stow Road Stow, OH 44224 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states MORGAN ADHESIVES COMPANY 4560 Stow Road Stow, OH 44224 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EASTON, David L. 73 Chadbourne Drive Hudson, OH 44236 / US | [1995/37] |
Former [1994/09] | 01 /
EASTIN, David, L. 73 Chadbourne Drive Hudson, OH 44236 / US | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Spall, Christopher John BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 92912350.3 | 05.05.1992 | [1994/09] | WO1992US03731 | Priority number, date | US19910697231 | 06.05.1991 Original published format: US 697231 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219444 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584235 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584235 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B31D1/02, G09F3/02 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
B31D1/021 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0202 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0225 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0229 (EP,US);
G09F2003/023 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0241 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0257 (EP,US);
G09F2003/026 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1994/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AUFWICKELBAREN, DRUCKEMPFINDLICHEN HAFTETIKETTS | [1995/37] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A SELF WOUND PRESSURE SENSITIVE LABEL | [1995/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE ETIQUETTE AUTOADHESIVE ENROULEE SUR ELLE-MEME | [1995/37] |
Former [1994/09] | AUFWICKELBARES, DRUCKEMPFINDLICHES HAFTETIKETT | ||
Former [1994/09] | SELF WOUND PRESSURE SENSITIVE LABEL | ||
Former [1994/09] | ETIQUETTE AUTOADHESIVE ENROULEE SUR ELLE-MEME | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3854229 (MORGAN B); | [Y]US4886680 (TINDALL JOHN D [GB]); | [A]FR2262363 (OREAL [FR]); | [A]DE3831088 (GASDA JOCHEN [DE]); | [A]GB2235176 (OSAKA SEALING LABEL PRINT [JP]) |