EP0660714 - NOVEL LIPOSOMAL DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMARX PHARMACEUTICAL CORP. 1635 East 18th Street Tucson, AZ 85719 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states ImaRx Pharmaceutical Corp. 1635 East 18th Street Tucson, AZ 85719 / US | ||
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states UNGER, Evan C 13365 E. Camino La Cebadilla Tucson, AZ 85749 / US | ||
For all designated states WU, Guanli 2602 W. Aiden Street Tucson, AZ 85745 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unger, Evan C. 13365 E. Camino La Cebadilla Tucson, Arizona 85749 / US | 02 /
Wu, Guanli 2602 W. Aiden Street Tucson, Arizona 85745 / US | [1997/21] |
Former [1995/27] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92912662.1 | 31.03.1992 | [1995/27] | WO1992US02614 | Priority number, date | US19910716899 | 18.06.1991 Original published format: US 716899 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222298 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660714 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660714 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/1278 (EP);
A61K41/0028 (EP);
A61K41/0052 (EP);
A61K47/6911 (EP);
A61K47/6925 (EP);
A61K49/1815 (EP);
A61K49/223 (EP);
A61K49/227 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
A61K9/1277 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/27] | A61K31/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | NEUE LIPOSOMALE ARZNEIMITTELFREISETZUNGSSYSTEME | [2002/39] | English: | NOVEL LIPOSOMAL DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS | [1995/27] | French: | NOUVEAUX SYSTEMES D'APPORT DE MEDICAMENTS AUX LIPOSOMES | [1995/27] |
Former [1995/27] | NEUE LIPOSOMALE ARZNEIMITTELFREINETZUNGSSYSTEME | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.1994 | Search fee paid | 18.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.01.1994 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.07.2003 | BE | 02.07.2003 | DK | 02.10.2003 | GR | 02.10.2003 | SE | 02.10.2003 | ES | 13.10.2003 | LU | 31.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
ES | 13.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
ES | 13.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
GR | 02.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0243947 (DORNIER MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4657756 (RASOR JULIA S [US], et al); | [XY]US4675310 (CHAPMAN DENNIS [GB], et al); | [XY]US4900540 (RYAN PATRICK J [US], et al) | Examination | DE2818655 | WO8603938 | WO9000389 | DE4013580 |