EP0606213 - CHARGE DOMAIN SYNAPSE CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 3065 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 3065 Bower Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTRO, Hernan, A. 3575 Meder Road Shingle Springs, CA 95682 / US | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92912786.8 | 22.05.1992 | [1994/29] | WO1992US04344 | Priority number, date | US19910747640 | 21.08.1991 Original published format: US 747640 | [1994/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304532 | Date: | 04.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606213 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/693, G06F15/80, G06G7/60 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06N3/065 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/29] | H03K17/693 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1994/29] | Title | German: | LADUNGSDOMÄNENSYNAPSENZELLE | [1994/29] | English: | CHARGE DOMAIN SYNAPSE CELL | [1994/29] | French: | CELLULE SYNAPTIQUE A DOMAINE DE CHARGE | [1994/29] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 02.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/13] | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9016084 (XICOR INC [US]) [A] 1* abstract * | [A] - MURRAY, "Silicon implementations of neural networks", IEE PROCEEDINGS F. COMMUNICATIONS, RADAR & SIGNAL PROCESSING, STEVENAGE GB, (199101), vol. 138, no. 1, pages 3 - 12 [A] 1 * page 6, column L, line 27 - page 7, column L, line 13; figures 5,6 * | [A] - SCHWARTZ, "Learning, function approximation and analog VLSI", PROCEEDINGS 1990 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, NEW ORLEANS , USA, (19900501), vol. 3, pages 2441 - 2445 [A] 1 * page 2442, column L, line 1 - page 2443, column L, line 21; figures 1-3 * | [A] - MEADOR, "An impulse realization of short-term-memory dynamics", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 32ND MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, CHAMPAIGN , USA, (19890814), pages 230 - 233 [A] 1 * page 231, column L, line 5 - page 233, column L, line 13; figure 1 * | [A] - SAGE, "MNOS/CCD circuits for neural network implementations", PROCEEDINGS 1989 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, PORTLAND , USA, (19890508), vol. 2, pages 1207 - 1209 [A] 1 * page 1207, column R, line 7 - line 17 * | International search | [AE]US5120996 (MEAD CARVER A [US], et al) |