EP0591302 - SUBSTITUTED SILYL ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CELEBUSKI, Joseph, E. 5080 Fox Lane Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92912815.5 | 05.06.1992 | [1994/15] | WO1992US04723 | Priority number, date | US19910712302 | 07.06.1991 Original published format: US 712302 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222557 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591302 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/08, C07F7/18 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
C07H1/02 (EP,US);
C07F7/08 (KR);
C07F7/081 (EP,US);
C07F7/18 (KR);
C07F9/2408 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/15] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE SILYLALKOHOLE | [1994/15] | English: | SUBSTITUTED SILYL ALCOHOLS | [1994/15] | French: | ALCOOLS DE SILYLE SUBSTITUES | [1994/15] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1993 | Search fee paid | 27.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 03.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/26] | 31.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1393113 (NATURAL RUBBER PRODUCERS) [X] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]DE2706490 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1-6 *whole document; in particular examples 10,11*; | [X]EP0291787 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) [X] 1-6 *examples* | [X] - EISCH, J.J. ET AL., "ORGANOSILICON COMPOUNDS WITH FUNCTIONAL GROUPS PROXIMATE TO SILICON. II. LITHIUM ALUMINUM HYDRIDE REDUCTION OF EPOXYETHYLSILANES", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1963), vol. 28, pages 2870 - 2876 [X] 1-6 * table II * | [X] - SPEIER, J.L. ET AL., "THE ADDITION OF SILICON HYDRIDES TO OLEFINIC DOUBLE BONDS. PART II. THE USE OF GROUP VIII METAL CATALYSTS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1957), vol. 79, pages 974 - 979 [X] 1-6 * table III * | [X] - EABORN, C. ET AL., "BASE CLEAVAGE OF THE BENZYL-SILICON BOND IN PHCH2SIME2(CH2)NOH (N = 2 OR 3) COMPOUNDS", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 209, pages 13 - 16 [X] 1-6 *experimental section* | [X] - HONG, M. ET AL., "SYNTHESIS AND PROPERTIES OF .BETA.-(ACETOXYL)ETHYLSILANES", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910401), vol. 114, no. 13, Database accession no. 122487g, page 812 [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [ ] - XIAMEN DAXUE XUEBAO, ZIRAN KEXUEBAN, (1989), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 812 - 622 | [X] - EABORN, C. ET AL., "THE MECHANISM OF THE GAS-PHASE PYROLYSIS OF ESTERS. PART 13. THE VERY STRONG ACTIVATING EFFECTS OF .BETA.-TRIALKYLMETAL GROUPS", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS II, (1982), pages 1313 - 1319 [X] 7-12 * table 4 * | International search | [A]US3943157 (HENRICK CLIVE A, et al); | [A]US4180682 (COHEN NOAL [US], et al); | [A]US4191842 (COHEN NOAL [US], et al); | [A]US4310465 (OLSON GARY L, et al); | [A]US4882451 (YOSHIDA NAOYUKI [JP], et al) |