EP0591304 - ELECTRONIC BALANCE CONTROL AND REGULATION FOR LIFTING GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRÖDTER, Wilhelm Zinnienstrasse 26 D-59071 Hamm / DE | [1994/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Effert, Udo Effert und Kollegen Patentanwälte Groß-Berliner-Damm 73 E 12487 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Effert, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Radickestrasse 48 D-12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 92912842.9 | 25.06.1992 | [1994/15] | WO1992DE00525 | Priority number, date | DE19914121334 | 25.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4121334 | [1994/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300285 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591304 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591304 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/00 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
B66C23/005 (EP);
B25J19/0012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/15] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE BALANCE-STEUERUNG UND -REGELUNG FÜR EIN HEBEZEUG | [1994/15] | English: | ELECTRONIC BALANCE CONTROL AND REGULATION FOR LIFTING GEAR | [1994/15] | French: | COMMANDE ET REGULATION ELECTRONIQUES DE L'EQUILIBRE D'ENGINS DE LEVAGE | [1994/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1997
WITHDRAWN Zasche Fördertechnik GmbH Gewerbestr. 23 86720 Nördlingen / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Thomas, et al, et al Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1997
WITHDRAWN Zasche Fördertechnik GmbH Gewerbestr. 23 86720 Nördlingen / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Thomas, et al, et al Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | 31.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.12.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 11.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 27.07.2001 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.10.1996 | LU | 30.06.1997 | AT | 25.06.2001 | CH | 30.06.2001 | LI | 30.06.2001 | [2003/09] |
Former [2003/01] | DK | 02.10.1996 | |
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
Former [2000/07] | DK | 02.10.1996 | |
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 02.10.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3940110 (MOTODA KENRO); | [A]FR2386473 (SCAGLIA MARIO [IT]); | [A]EP0035282 (THERMWOOD CORP [US]); | [A]GB2095644 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]EP0016330 ; | [A]EP0113457 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |