EP0668869 - 2- 3-(4-AMIDINOPHENYL)]PROPIONIC ACID DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1998/20] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACK, Helmut Georg-Feil-Strasse 4 D-6701 Meckenheim / DE | 02 /
PFEIFFER, Thomas Von-Denis-Strasse 20 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
HOEFFKEN, Hans, Wolfgang Dammstueckerweg 101 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
BOEHM, Hans-Joachim Hans-Sachs-Strasse 32 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
HORNBERGER, Wilfried Mundenheimer Strasse 152 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1995/35] | Application number, filing date | 92913125.8 | 23.06.1992 | [1995/35] | WO1992EP01411 | Priority number, date | DE19914121947 | 03.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4121947 | [1995/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301208 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668869 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0668869 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, A61K38/05 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
C07K5/06139 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K5/0606 (EP,US);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/35] | C07K5/06, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | 2- 3-(4-AMIDINO-PHENYL)]-PROPIONSÄUREDERIVATE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1995/35] | English: | 2- 3-(4-AMIDINOPHENYL)]PROPIONIC ACID DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE | [1995/35] | French: | DERIVES DE L'ACIDE 2- 3-(4-AMIDINO-PHENYL)]-PROPIONIQUE, LEUR FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1995/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.1993 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0236163 (SANOFI SA [FR]) | [A] - PHARMAZIE Bd. 41, Nr. 4, 1986, BERLIN,DEUTSCHLAND Seiten 233 - 235; VOIGT ET AL: 'Synthese von N-alfa-(arylsulfonyl-l-prolyl)- und N-alfa-ben zyloxycarbonyl-l-prolyl)-d,l-4-amidinophenylalan inamiden als trombininhibitoren' |