EP0586585 - 1,2-DIHYDROPYRIDO(3,4-B)PYRAZINES AS FUNGICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southern Research Institute 2000 Ninth Avenue, South P.O. Box 5305 Birmingham Alabama 35255-5305 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states SOUTHERN RESEARCH INSTITUTE 2000 Ninth Avenue, South P.O. Box 5305 Birmingham Alabama 35255-5305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEMPLE, Carroll, G., Jr. 2224 Lynnchester Circle Birmingham, AL 35215 / US | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Schulmeyer, Karl-Heinz Kieler Strasse 59a 25474 Hasloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Schulmeyer, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Kieler Strasse 59a D-25474 Hasloh / DE | Application number, filing date | 92913484.9 | 17.04.1992 | [1994/11] | WO1992US03202 | Priority number, date | US19910704217 | 22.05.1991 Original published format: US 704217 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9220680 | Date: | 26.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586585 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586585 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/495, // (C07D471/04, 241:00, 221:00) | [1994/34] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/11] | C07D471/04, A01N47/22, A01N47/20, A01N47/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | 1,2-DIHYDROPYRIDO(3,4-B)PYRAZINE ALS FUNGIZIDE | [1994/11] | English: | 1,2-DIHYDROPYRIDO(3,4-B)PYRAZINES AS FUNGICIDES | [1994/11] | French: | 1,2-DIHYDROPYRIDO (3,4-B)PYRAZINES UTILISEES COMME FONGICIDES | [1994/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 18.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2000 | BE | 05.07.2000 | CH | 05.07.2000 | ES | 05.07.2000 | FR | 05.07.2000 | GR | 05.07.2000 | IT | 05.07.2000 | LI | 05.07.2000 | NL | 05.07.2000 | DK | 05.10.2000 | SE | 05.10.2000 | DE | 06.10.2000 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
CH | 05.07.2000 | ||
ES | 05.07.2000 | ||
FR | 05.07.2000 | ||
GR | 05.07.2000 | ||
LI | 05.07.2000 | ||
NL | 05.07.2000 | ||
DK | 05.10.2000 | ||
SE | 05.10.2000 | ||
DE | 06.10.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
CH | 05.07.2000 | ||
ES | 05.07.2000 | ||
GR | 05.07.2000 | ||
LI | 05.07.2000 | ||
NL | 05.07.2000 | ||
DK | 05.10.2000 | ||
SE | 05.10.2000 | ||
DE | 06.10.2000 | ||
FR | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
CH | 05.07.2000 | ||
ES | 05.07.2000 | ||
LI | 05.07.2000 | ||
NL | 05.07.2000 | ||
DK | 05.10.2000 | ||
SE | 05.10.2000 | ||
DE | 06.10.2000 | ||
FR | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
CH | 05.07.2000 | ||
ES | 05.07.2000 | ||
LI | 05.07.2000 | ||
NL | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.10.2000 | ||
DE | 06.10.2000 | ||
FR | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
CH | 05.07.2000 | ||
ES | 05.07.2000 | ||
LI | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.10.2000 | ||
DE | 06.10.2000 | ||
FR | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
CH | 05.07.2000 | ||
LI | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.10.2000 | ||
DE | 06.10.2000 | ||
FR | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
CH | 05.07.2000 | ||
LI | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.10.2000 | ||
FR | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.10.2000 | ||
FR | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
FR | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
BE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 05.07.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4450160 (TEMPLE JR CARROLL G [US], et al) |