EP0593539 - IRON CHELATE CULTURE MEDIUM ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUHR-JESSEN, Peter, Bernt Mosegaard Park 25 DK-3500 Vaerlöse / DK | [1994/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/36] |
Former [1994/17] | Thalsoe-Madsen, Kine Birgit, et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 92913614.1 | 18.06.1992 | [1994/17] | WO1992DK00190 | Priority number, date | EP19910610054 | 21.06.1991 Original published format: EP 91610054 | [1994/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300423 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593539 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
C12N5/005 (EP);
C12N2500/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/17] | Title | German: | ADDITIV FÜR KULTURMEDIUM AUF DER BASIS VON EISENCHELATEN | [1994/17] | English: | IRON CHELATE CULTURE MEDIUM ADDITIVE | [1994/17] | French: | ADDITIF POUR MILIEU DE CULTURE A BASE DE CHELATE DE FER | [1994/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 02.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/26] | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP63077801 ; | [A]JP63141584 ; | [XY]GB2196348 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED); | [Y]EP0274445 (MEDI CULT AS [NO], et al) | [Y] - Dialog Information Services, File 351, WPI, Dialog Accession No. 008681836, WPI Accession No. 91-185855/26, LOEFFLER-INST: "Chemical absorption of ammonia in viral replication medium - by adding iron citrate which reacts to form mixed ligand complex, used in prodn. of antigens for vaccines", DD,A,286612, 910131, 9126 (Basic). | [X] - Dialog Information Services, File 351, WPI, Dialog Accession No. 009027456, WPI Accession No. 92-154816/19, TOSOH CORP: "Complete synthetic medium - contains iron citrate, ethanolamine and linolic acid, oleic acid and/or taurine, does not contain protein, cell growth factor, hormone and steroid"; JP,A,04 091 786, 920325, 9219 | [X] - Tibtech, Vol. 7, September 1989 E. SHACTER: "Serum-free media for bulk culture of hybridoma cells and the preparation of monoclonal antibodies", see page 248 - page 253, see page 249, right column. | [A] - National Library of Medicine, Database Medline, Accession No. 89124403, SCHNEIDER Y.: "Optimisation of hybridoma cell growth and monoclonal antibody secretion in a chemically defined, serum- and protein-free culture medium", & J Immunol Methods 1989 Jan 6;116(1):65-77. | [X] - National Library of Medicine, Database Medline, Accession No. 88284722, KOVAR J.: "Growth-stimulating effect of ferric citrate on hybridoma cells: characterization and relation to transferrin function", & Hybridoma 1988 Jun; 7(3):255-63. | [X] - Dialog Information Services, Database BIOSIS, File 5, Dialog Accession No. 9045773, Biosis Accession No. 93030773, FRANEK F.: "Hybridoma growth and monoclonal antibody production in iron-rich protein-free medium effect of nutrient concentration", & Cytotechnology 7 (1), 1991, 33-38. | [X] - Dialog Information Services, File 155, Medline, Dialog Accession No. 05755034, Medline Accession No. 86056034, REDDEL RR.: "Cell cycle effects of iron depletion on T-47D human breast cancer cells", Exp Cell Res, Dec 1985, 161 (2) p277-84. | [X] - Dialog Information Services, File 155, Medline, Dialog Accession No. 06308060, Medline Accession No. 87282060, HERSHKO C. et al.: "Modification of iron uptake and lipid peroxidation by hypoxia, ascorbic acid, and alpha-tocopherol in iron-loaded rat myocardial cell cultures", & J Lab Clin Med Sep 1987 110 (3) p355-61. | [A] - Dialog Information Services, File 155, Medline, Dialog Accession No. 02890092, Medline Accession No. 76071092, HILL JH et al.: "Iron-induced enhancement of 67Ga uptake in a model human leukocyte culture system", & J Nucl Med Dec 1975, 16 (12) p1183-6. | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 12, No. 209, C504; & JP,A,63 077 801, publ 1988-01-13 Nippon Zenyaku Kogyo K.K., & JP63077801 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 12, No. 398, C538; & JP,A,63 141 584, publ 1988-06-14 Chemo Sero Therapeut Res Inst., & JP63141584 A 00000000 |