EP0542996 - SUGAR-BASED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 214 Technology Innovation Center, Oakdale Research Campus Oakdale, IA 52319 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 214 Technology Innovation Center, Oakdale Research Campus Oakdale, IA 52319 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORDICK, Jonathan, S. R.R.6 2 Timber Ridge Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | 02 /
RETHWISCH, David, G. 318 Willis Drive Iowa City, IA 52245 / US | 03 /
PATIL, Damodar, R. 1908, 5th Ave. N.E. No.I-2 East Grand Forks, MN 56721 / US | [1993/51] |
Former [1993/21] | 01 /
DORDICK, Jonathan, S. R.R.6 2 Timber Ridge Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | ||
02 /
RETHWISCH, David, G. 318 Willis Drive Iowa City, IA 52245 / US | |||
03 /
PATIL, Damodar, R. 206 5th Street Coralville, IA 52241 / US | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1993/21] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92913831.1 | 27.05.1992 | [1993/21] | WO1992US04517 | Priority number, date | US19910706929 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: US 706929 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9221765 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542996 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0542996 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/04, C12P19/00, C07H13/02, C07H15/04, C08B37/00 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP);
C08B37/00 (EP);
C12P19/00 (EP);
C12P19/02 (EP);
C12P19/04 (EP);
C12P19/44 (EP);
C12P7/62 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/21] | C12P19/04, C12P19/00, C07H13/02, C07H15/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/21] | Title | German: | POLYMERE AUF ZUCKERBASIS | [1993/21] | English: | SUGAR-BASED POLYMERS | [1993/21] | French: | POLYMERES A BASE DE SUCRE | [1993/21] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1993 | Search fee paid | 24.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 12.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.1999 | BE | 11.08.1999 | CH | 11.08.1999 | ES | 11.08.1999 | FR | 11.08.1999 | GR | 11.08.1999 | IT | 11.08.1999 | LI | 11.08.1999 | NL | 11.08.1999 | SE | 11.08.1999 | DK | 11.11.1999 | DE | 12.11.1999 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
FR | 11.08.1999 | ||
GR | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DK | 11.11.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
GR | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DK | 11.11.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
FR | 07.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DK | 11.11.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
FR | 07.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
NL | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
FR | 07.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
ES | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
FR | 07.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
SE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
FR | 07.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/06] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
FR | 07.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
CH | 16.11.1999 | ||
LI | 16.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
DE | 12.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | DE | 12.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58087174 ; | [YP]JP4149270 ; | [AP]WO9117255 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US]) | [Y] - Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 83-62939K & JP-A-58 087 174 (NIPPON URETHANE) 24 May 1983, & JP58087174 A 19830524 | [YP] - Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 92-223547 & JP-A-4 149 270 (DAINIPPON INK) 22 May 1992, & JP4149270 A 19920522 | International search | [Y]US3265641 (MARCO WISMER, et al); | [Y]DD148058 (GUETTES BERND, et al) | [Y] - Biotechnology and Bioengineering, Volume 37, issued March 1991, D. R. PATIL et al., "Enzymatic Synthesis of a Sucrose-Containing. Linaer Polyester in Nearly Anhydrous Organic Media" pages 639-646 DD,A, 148,058 (VEB Synthesewerk Schwarzheide) 06 May 1981 (with English translation). see entire document. |