EP0597876 - EXERCISE GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEALTH VENTURES 3011 North IH-35, Suite 100 Austin, Texas 78722 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states Price, Lisa N. 408 Cloverleaf, No. 3 San Antonio, Texas 78209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Price, Lisa N. 900 Burr Road, N. 2A San Antonio, Texas 78209 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1994/21] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92913891.5 | 04.06.1992 | [1994/21] | WO1992US04652 | Priority number, date | US19910711171 | 05.06.1991 Original published format: US 711171 | [1994/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222222 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597876 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597876 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A41D1/22, A41D7/00, A41D13/00 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
A41D13/0017 (EP,US);
A41D31/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/21] | A41D1/22, A41D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/21] | Title | German: | ÜBUNGSBEKLEIDUNG | [1994/21] | English: | EXERCISE GARMENT | [1994/21] | French: | VETEMENT D'EXERCICE | [1994/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1993 | Search fee paid | 14.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 29.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US1205446 (GOLDEN GEORGE I [US]); | [A]US1599637 (VITA BUCHANAN); | [A]DE460901 (BESS M MENSENDIECK GEB DE VARE); | [Y]US1793145 (ALICE VIZZARD); | [A]US1957102 (EARNSHAW GEORGE F); | [A]US2060689 (DOROTHY READ); | [A]US4026547 (SILVERSTOLPE MARIANNE, et al); | [Y]US4179754 (DENU FRANCIS [FR]); | [A]US4698847 (YOSHIHARA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]US4746318 (MOYER NANETTE C [US]); | [A]US4789372 (WICKS TRENNA R [US]); | [A]US4866789 (DORM DWIGHT [US]); | [Y]GB2217579 (HALSTEAD ROGER GEOFFREY); | [A]US4956878 (BOYNTON NANCY V [US]); | [A]US4983140 (GIMBLE RICHARD [US]); | [XPY]US5040524 (VOTEL THOMAS F [US], et al); | [AP]US5042092 (EWING ELIZABETH [US]); | [AP]US5046194 (ALANIZ IRMA P [US], et al) | [Y] - The Journal of the American Medical Association, Vol. 168, No. 7, issued 18 October 1958, (Far Rockaway 91, New York), MAURICE GERSHMAN, "Self Adhering Nylon Tapes", see page 930. | Examination | EP0459082 |