EP0678177 - VALVE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB FLÄKT AKTIEBOLAG 120 86 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states ABB FLÄKT AKTIEBOLAG S-120 86 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states ABB FLÄKT AB Sickla Allé 13 S-131 34 Nacka / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AURELL, Eskil Sandviksvägen 34 C S-352 41 Växjö / SE | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Jenkler, Malte ABB Group Services Center AB Legal & Compliance/Intellectual Property 721 78 Västeras / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Jenkler, Malte Asea Brown Boveri AB Patent Stockholm Office S-120 86 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 92914613.2 | 23.06.1992 | [1995/43] | WO1992SE00453 | Priority number, date | SE19910002082 | 04.07.1991 Original published format: SE 9102082 | [1995/43] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301433 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678177 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678177 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/17 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
F16K31/402 (EP,US);
B01D46/71 (EP,US);
F16K31/406 (EP,US);
F17C13/04 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0305 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0323 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0341 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0385 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/43] | Title | German: | VENTILANORDNUNG | [1998/39] | English: | VALVE ARRANGEMENT | [1995/43] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE SOUPAPE | [1998/39] |
Former [1995/43] | VENTILZUSAMMENSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1995/43] | VANNE | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1993 | Translation filed | 29.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.12.1993 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.1998 | BE | 23.09.1998 | CH | 23.09.1998 | ES | 23.09.1998 | IT | 23.09.1998 | LI | 23.09.1998 | NL | 23.09.1998 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 23.09.1998 | |
BE | 23.09.1998 | ||
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
ES | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
NL | 23.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 23.09.1998 | |
BE | 23.09.1998 | ||
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
ES | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 23.09.1998 | |
BE | 23.09.1998 | ||
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 23.09.1998 | |
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | CH | 23.09.1998 | |
LI | 23.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0004526 (SVENSKA FLAEKTFABRIKEN AB [SE]); | [A]US4190230 (GEISSBUHLER HANS [CH]); | [AE]SE466362 (FLAEKT AB [SE]) |