EP0592560 - A POSITION INDICATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GP & C Systems International AB Ringvägen 56 E 13335 Saltsjöbaden / SE | [1998/02] |
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states LANS, Hakan Ringvägen 56 E S-133 00 Saltsjöbaden / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lans, Hakan Ringvägen 56 E 13335 Saltsjöbaden / SE | [1998/02] |
Former [1994/16] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Grennberg, Erik Bertil, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Grennberg, Erik Bertil, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 92914913.6 | 29.06.1992 | [1994/16] | WO1992SE00485 | Priority number, date | SE19910002034 | 01.07.1991 Original published format: SE 9102034 | SE19910002362 | 15.08.1991 Original published format: SE 9102362 | SE19910003542 | 28.11.1991 Original published format: SE 9103542 | [1994/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301576 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0592560 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592560 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G08G3/02, G08G5/04 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
G08G5/0043 (EP,US);
G01S19/15 (EP,US);
G01S5/0072 (EP,US);
G08G5/0008 (EP,US);
G08G5/0013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/16] | Title | German: | STELLUNGSANZEIGESYSTEM | [1994/16] | English: | A POSITION INDICATING SYSTEM | [1994/16] | French: | SYSTEME INDIQUANT UNE POSITION | [1994/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4380050 (TANNER JESSE H [US]); | [A]GB2155720 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]WO8800379 (LMT RADIO PROFESSIONELLE [FR]); | [A]US4835537 (MANION JAMES H [US]) |