EP0593609 - HIGH SPEED SWITCHING ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELSTRA CORPORATION LIMITED 231 Elizabeth Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | [1994/28] |
Former [1994/17] | For all designated states AUSTRALIAN AND OVERSEAS TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION LIMITED 231 Elizabeth Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLLETT, Douglas, James 4 Colin Place Carlingford, NSW 2218 / AU | [1994/17] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Meddle, Alan Leonard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92914940.9 | 01.07.1992 | [1994/17] | WO1992AU00322 | Priority number, date | AU19910006968 | 01.07.1991 Original published format: AU 696891 | [1994/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301669 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593609 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.01.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/54, H04L12/56 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04L49/153 (EP,US);
H04L49/1538 (EP,US);
H04L49/1561 (EP,US);
H04L49/255 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/17] | Title | German: | VERMITTLUNGSARCHITEKTUR MIT HOHER GESCHWINDIGKEIT | [1994/17] | English: | HIGH SPEED SWITCHING ARCHITECTURE | [1994/17] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE COMMUTATION A GRANDE VITESSE | [1994/17] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 25.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 03.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/31] | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0338558 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 7, line 14 - line 33 * * column 9, line 11 - column 11, line 32 * * figures 6,7 * | [DA] - YIH-CHYUN JENQ, "Performance Analysis of a Packet Switch Based on Single-Buffered Banyan Network", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (198312), vol. 1, no. 6, pages 1014 - 1021 [DA] 1 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]AU1262888 (ALCATEL NV); | [X]AU2652688 (ALCATEL NV); | [PX]EP0471380 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |