EP0595883 - METHOD OF JOINING PIPES AND PIPE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYCHEM LIMITED Rolls House, 7 Rolls Buildings, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1NH / GB | For all designated states N.V. RAYCHEM S.A. Diestsesteenweg 692 B-3200 Kessel-lo / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states RAYCHEM LIMITED Rolls House 7, Rolls Buildings Fetter Lane London, EC4A 1NH / GB | ||
For all designated states N.V. RAYCHEM S.A. Diestsesteenweg 692 B-3200 Kessel-lo / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ESCH, Willy Langelostraat 43 B-3212 Pellenberg / BE | 02 /
VAN BEERSEL, Jozef Hollebeekstraat 121 B-9140 Temse / BE | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Auckland Cooke, Jacqueline, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Auckland Cooke, Jacqueline, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92915425.0 | 22.07.1992 | [1994/19] | WO1992GB01345 | Priority number, date | GB19910015794 | 22.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9115794 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302316 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595883 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/00 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
F16L47/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | ROHRKUPPLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON ROHREN | [1994/19] | English: | METHOD OF JOINING PIPES AND PIPE JOINT | [1994/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE RACCORDEMENT DE TUYAUX ET RACCORD DE TUYAUX | [1994/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 30.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/10] | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4709948 ; | [A]FR2250950 ; | [A]US3379218 ; | [A]GB2134334 |