EP0593644 - MAGNETIC RECORDING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Christopher, M. Minnesota 3M Research Ltd. Pinnacles, Harlow Essex CM19 5AE / GB | 02 /
NORMAN, Colin, F., W. 14 Apsley Close Bishop's Stortford Hertfordshire / GB | [1994/17] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92915535.6 | 07.07.1992 | [1994/17] | WO1992US05705 | Priority number, date | GB19910014668 | 08.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9114668 | [1994/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301592 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593644 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0593644 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/702 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
G11B5/702 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/17] | Title | German: | Magnetische Aufzeichnungsmaterialien | [1994/17] | English: | MAGNETIC RECORDING MATERIALS | [1994/17] | French: | MATIERES D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE | [1994/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9014662 |