EP0595893 - APPARATUS FOR REMOVING CATARACTOUS-LENS TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'ESPERANCE MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1 East 71st Street New York, NY 10021 / US | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
L'ESPERANCE, Francis, A. 255 Oakwood Road Englewood, NJ 07631 / US | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92915556.2 | 06.07.1992 | [1994/19] | WO1992US05637 | Priority number, date | US19910732801 | 19.07.1991 Original published format: US 732801 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301757 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595893 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595893 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/36, A61F9/00 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
A61F9/008 (EP,US);
A61F9/00763 (EP,US);
A61B18/20 (EP,US);
A61F2009/0087 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00887 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/19] | A61B17/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON LINSENTRÜBUNGSGEWEBE | [1994/19] | English: | APPARATUS FOR REMOVING CATARACTOUS-LENS TISSUE | [1994/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ELIMINATION DE TISSUS DU CRISTALLIN ATTEINT DE CATARACTE | [1994/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.1994 | Search fee paid | 16.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 31.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.1998 | BE | 09.09.1998 | CH | 09.09.1998 | ES | 09.09.1998 | FR | 09.09.1998 | GR | 09.09.1998 | IT | 09.09.1998 | LI | 09.09.1998 | NL | 09.09.1998 | DK | 09.12.1998 | SE | 09.12.1998 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
ES | 09.09.1998 | ||
FR | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
NL | 09.09.1998 | ||
DK | 09.12.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
ES | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
NL | 09.09.1998 | ||
DK | 09.12.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
ES | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
NL | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
ES | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
CH | 14.12.1998 | ||
LI | 14.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 09.09.1998 | |
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 09.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3630203 (WISAP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,12 * page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO8804157 (VASER INC [US]) [A] 1,5,12; | [A]EP0365228 (PFIZER HOSPITAL PROD [US]); | [A]US4955882 (HAKKY SAID I) [A] 1,5,12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US3732858 (BANKO A); | [Y]US4589414 (YOSHIDA YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [Y]US4760840 (FOURNIER JR GEORGE R [US], et al); | [Y]US4825865 (ZELMAN JERRY [US]); | [YP]US5061266 (HAKKY SAID I); | [YE]US5129896 (HASSON HARRITH M [US]) |