EP0554456 - FACSIMILE-MAIL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Akihiro, Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92915887.1 | 16.07.1992 | [1993/32] | WO1992JP00909 | Priority number, date | JP19910179456 | 19.07.1991 Original published format: JP 17945691 | [1993/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302516 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554456 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554456 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/54, H04L12/58, H04N1/32 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
H04N1/32416 (EP,US);
H04L51/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/324 (EP,US);
H04M3/533 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/32] | Title | German: | FAKSIMILEPOSTVORRICHTUNG | [1993/32] | English: | FACSIMILE-MAIL DEVICE | [1993/32] | French: | SYSTEME DE CORRESPONDANCE PAR TELECOPIE | [1993/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1993 | Translation filed | 09.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1993 | Search fee paid | 09.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2134043 ; | [X]JP63073755 ; | [A]US4870678 (ADACHI EIICHI [JP]); | [A]EP0378694 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 371 (E-963)10 August 1990 & JP-A-2 134 043 ( OKI ELECTRIC IND. CO.,LTD. ) 23 May 1990, & JP2134043 A 19900523 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 304 (E-646)18 August 1988 & JP-A-63 073 755 ( NIPPON TELEGR &TELEPH CORP. | International search | JPS6382141 [ ] (RICOH KK); | JPS6387045 [ ] (TOSHIBA CORP); | JPH022268 [ ] (TOSHIBA CORP) |