EP0651640 - USE OF 7-FLUORO-1-METHYL-3-METHYLSULPHINYL-4-QUINOLONE IN THE TREATMENT OF ANGINA PECTORIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNOLL AG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states Knoll AG Knollstrasse D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states The Boots Company PLC 1 Thane Road West Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSSON, Mervyn The Boots Company plc 1 Thane Road West Nottingham NG2 3AA / GB | 02 /
REES, John Andrew The Boots Company plc 1 Thane RRoad West Nottingham NG2 3AA / GB | [1995/19] | Representative(s) | Bieberbach, Andreas, et al BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX / K - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Bieberbach, Andreas, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1995/19] | Thacker, Michael Anthony THE BOOTS COMPANY PLC Group Patents Department 10th Floor, Newland House 49 Mount Street Nottingham NG2 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92916001.8 | 21.07.1992 | [1995/19] | WO1992EP01640 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9402144 | Date: | 03.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651640 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/19] | Title | German: | Verwendung von 7 - Fluoro-1-Methyl-3-Methylsulphenyl-4-chinolon zur Behandlungvon Angina Pectoris | [1995/19] | English: | USE OF 7-FLUORO-1-METHYL-3-METHYLSULPHINYL-4-QUINOLONE IN THE TREATMENT OF ANGINA PECTORIS | [1995/19] | French: | UTILISATION DE 7-FLUORO-1-METHYL-3-METHYLSULPHINYL-4-QUINOLONE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ANGINE DE POITRINE | [1995/19] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/02] | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9010445 ; | [A]EP0149519 | [A] - AMERICAN HEART JOURNAL vol. 121, no. 3, 1991, pages 974 - 983 D.B. YATES ET AL. 'PHARMACOLOGY OF FLOSEQUINAN' | [A] - JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY vol. 15, no. 6, 1990, pages 900 - 910 S. GREENBERG ET AL. 'POSITIVE INOTROPY CONTRIBUTES TO THE HEMODYNAMIC MECHANISM OF ACTION OF FLOSEQUINAN IN THE INTACT DOG' | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 22, 1985, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 183569e, 'USE OF QUINOLONES FOR TREATING CORONARY INSUFFICIENCY' | [A] - DRUGS OF THE FUTURE vol. 11, no. 3, 1986, pages 177 - 178 R. MANNHOLD 'BTS-49465' | [X] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY vol. 24, 1989, pages 73 - 76 A. SCHNEEWEISS ET AL. 'THE EFFECT OF FLOSEQUINAN IN PATIENTS WITH HEART FAILURE OF ACUTE ONSET COMPLICATING ACUTE MYOCARDIAL INFARCTION' |