EP0594764 - HEMATOPOIETIC GROWTH FACTOR DERIVED FROM T LYMPHOCYTES AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Choudhury, Chandra 1610 Robert E. Lee Blvd., Apt. 29 New Orleans Louisiana 70122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states Choudhury, Chandra 1610 Robert E. Lee Blvd., Apt. 29 New Orleans, Louisiana 70122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Brown, John David FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92916012.5 | 07.07.1992 | [1994/18] | WO1992US05707 | Priority number, date | US19910729135 | 12.07.1991 Original published format: US 729135 | US19910747784 | 19.08.1991 Original published format: US 747784 | US19910788115 | 01.11.1991 Original published format: US 788115 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300923 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0594764 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0594764 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/27, C07K1/00, C07K14/00, C07K16/00, C07K17/00, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/564, A61K38/00, C12N1/21, C12P21/02, C12P21/08, C12N5/00, G01N33/68 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6876 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07K14/53 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/21] | C12N15/27, C07K3/00, C07K13/00, C07K15/00, C07K17/00, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/564, A61K37/02, C12N1/21, C12P21/02, C12P21/08, C12N5/00, G01N33/68 | ||
Former IPC [1994/18] | A61K37/02, C07H15/12, C07K3/00, C07K13/00, C07K15/00, C07K17/00, C12N5/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/564 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | AUS T-LYMPHOZYTEN GEWONNENER HÄMATOPOIETISCHER WACHSTUMSFAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [1994/18] | English: | HEMATOPOIETIC GROWTH FACTOR DERIVED FROM T LYMPHOCYTES AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR | [1994/18] | French: | FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE HEMATOPO ETIQUE DERIVE DE LYMPHOCYTES T ET METHODES D'UTILISATION | [1994/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.1994 | Search fee paid | 10.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.01.2000 | GR | 12.01.2000 | SE | 12.01.2000 | DK | 12.04.2000 | MC | 31.07.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 12.01.2000 | |
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
DK | 12.04.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | ES | 12.01.2000 | |
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 12.01.2000 | |
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 12.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0399777 (CHOUDHURY CHANDRA [US]) [X] 1-22,24,25,34-38,40-43* the whole document * | International search | [XY]EP0299206 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al) | [XY] - Journal of Biological Chemistry, Volume 263, Number 30, issued 25 October 1988, E.E. WOLLMAN et al., "Cloning and Expression of a cDNA for Human Thioredoxin", pages 15506-15512, especially Abstract and Fig. 2. | [XY] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 11, Number 10, issued 1983, R.C. BLEACKLEY et al., "Translation of lymphocyte mRNA for mouse colony stimulating factor", pages 3027-3035, especially pages 3027-3028. | [A] - EMBO Journal, Volume 8, Number 3, issued 1989, Y. TAGAYA et al., "ATL-derived factor (ADF), an IL-2 receptor/Tac inducer homologous to thioredoxin; possible involvement of dithiol-reduction in the IL-2 receptor induction", pages 757-764. | [A] - Journal of Leukocyte Biology, Volume 35, issued 1984, M. OCCHIONERO et al., "Functional Characterization of Lymphokines From the EL-4 T Cell Line That Activate Macrophages for Nonspecific Tumor Cytotoxicity", pages 405-414. | [A] - Nature, Volume 339, issue of 04 May 1989, D. METCALF, "The molecular control of cell division, differentiation commitment and maturation in haemopoietic cells", pages 27-30. | [A] - Infection and Immunity, Volume 51, Number 1, issued January 1986, M. OWHASHI et al., "Granulocyte-Macrophage Colony-Stimulating Factor Produced by Splenic T Lymphocytes of Mice Infected with Schistosoma japonicum", pages 213-217. | [A] - Experimental Hematology, Volume 12, issued 1984, J.S. GREENBERGER et al., "Production of Colony-stimulating Factor(s) for Granulocyte-Macrophage and Multipotential (Granulocyte/Erythroid/Megakaryocyte/Macrop hage)Hematopoietic Progenitor Cells (CFU-GEMM)by Clonal Lines of Human IL-2-dependent T-lymphocytes", pages |