EP0548354 - GOLD COMPOUNDS AS ANTIFOGGANTS IN HIGH SILVER CHLORIDE EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUDZ, Jerzy, Antoni 46 Waterford Way Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92916612.2 | 21.07.1992 | [1993/26] | WO1992US06010 | Priority number, date | US19910733939 | 22.07.1991 Original published format: US 733939 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302390 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548354 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/34, G03C1/035 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
G03C1/035 (EP);
G03C1/07 (EP);
G03C1/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | GOLD-VERBINDUNGEN ALS ANTISCHLEIERMITTEL IN SILBERCHLORID-REICHEN EMULSIONEN | [1993/26] | English: | GOLD COMPOUNDS AS ANTIFOGGANTS IN HIGH SILVER CHLORIDE EMULSIONS | [1993/26] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSES D'OR COMME AGENT ANTIVOILE DANS DES EMULSIONS AYANT UNE TENEUR ELEVEE EN CHLORURE D'AGENT | [1993/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/20] | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP63213836 ; | [A]US2598079 ; | [A]US2597856 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 4 (P-809)(3352) 9 January 1989 & JP,A,63 213 836 ( MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD ) 6 September 1988, & JP63213836 A 19880906 |