EP0595998 - METHOD OF FORMING UNIVERSAL JOINT HOUSINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN Automotive Inc. 3300 University Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2362 / US | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUDE, Werner Pfarrer Stauf 32 D-53819 Neunkirchen-Seel 1 / DE | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 D-53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92916622.1 | 14.07.1992 | [1994/19] | WO1992US05867 | Priority number, date | US19910735449 | 25.07.1991 Original published format: US 735449 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301908 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595998 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B21K21/00 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
F16D3/2237 (EP,US);
B21C23/20 (EP,US);
B21K1/762 (EP,US);
B21K1/765 (EP,US);
F16D2250/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49794 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FORMEN VON GEHÄUSEN FÜR UNIVERSAL-GELENKE | [1994/19] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING UNIVERSAL JOINT HOUSINGS | [1994/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ENVELOPPES DE JOINTS DE CARDAN | [1994/19] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.1994 | Search fee paid | 21.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 26.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/35] | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US717886 (MERCADER CAMILLE [US], et al); | [Y]US2755543 (DUNN GEORGE E, et al); | [A]US3336782 (LUCIEN PERAS) |