EP0554421 - THE USE OF FUNCTIONALS FLUIDS COMPRISING TRIGLYCERIDES AND VARIOUS ADDITIVES AS TRACTOR OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/32] | FUNCTIONAL FLUID WITH TRIGLYCERIDES, DETERGENT-INHIBITOR ADDITIVES AND VISCOSITY MODIFYING ADDITIVES | ||
[2001/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092-2298 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states THE LUBRIZOL CORPORATION 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092-2298 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOFFA, John, V. 27040 Butternut Ridge North Olmsted, OH 44070 / US | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92916789.8 | 22.07.1992 | [1993/32] | WO1992US06154 | Priority number, date | US19910743536 | 09.08.1991 Original published format: US 743536 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9303123 | Date: | 18.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554421 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554421 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, // (C10M169/04, 101:04, 105:36, 105:38, 133:12, 133:44, 133:52, 135:02, 135:36, 149:02, 159:20), C10N40:04 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
C10M169/048 (EP,US);
C10M101/04 (EP,US);
C10M105/36 (EP,US);
C10M105/38 (EP,US);
C10M105/42 (EP,US);
C10M133/12 (EP,US);
C10M133/44 (EP,US);
C10M133/52 (EP,US);
C10M135/02 (EP,US);
C10M135/36 (EP,US);
C10M149/02 (EP,US);
C10M159/20 (EP,US);
C10M159/22 (EP,US);
C10M159/24 (EP,US);
C10M2207/028 (EP,US);
C10M2207/123 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2207/22 (EP,US);
C10M2207/26 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2825 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2835 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2855 (EP,US);
C10M2207/30 (EP,US);
C10M2207/301 (EP,US);
C10M2207/302 (EP,US);
C10M2207/304 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2207/40 (EP,US);
C10M2207/401 (EP,US);
C10M2207/404 (EP,US);
C10M2207/4045 (EP,US);
C10M2209/101 (EP,US);
C10M2209/111 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/06 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/065 (EP,US);
C10M2215/066 (EP,US);
C10M2215/067 (EP,US);
C10M2215/068 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/12 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/24 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2217/02 (EP,US);
C10M2217/023 (EP,US);
C10M2217/024 (EP,US);
C10M2217/028 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10M2219/02 (EP,US);
C10M2219/022 (EP,US);
C10M2219/024 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2219/087 (EP,US);
C10M2219/088 (EP,US);
C10M2219/089 (EP,US);
C10M2219/106 (EP,US);
C10M2219/108 (EP,US);
C10N2010/00 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/32] | Title | German: | DIE VERWENDUNG VON FUNKTIONELLEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT TRIGLYCERIDEN UND VERSCHIEDENEN ADDITIVEN ALS TRAKTORSCHMIERÖLE | [2001/11] | English: | THE USE OF FUNCTIONALS FLUIDS COMPRISING TRIGLYCERIDES AND VARIOUS ADDITIVES AS TRACTOR OILS | [2001/11] | French: | UTILISATION DE FLUIDES FONCTIONNELS COMPORTANT DES TRIGLYCERIDES ET DES ADDITIVES DIVERS EN TANT QU'HUILES POUR TRACTEURS | [2001/11] |
Former [1993/32] | Funktionelle Flüssigkeit mit Triglyceriden, Detergens, Inhibitoradditiven und viskositätsmodifizierenden Additiven | ||
Former [1993/32] | FUNCTIONAL FLUID WITH TRIGLYCERIDES, DETERGENT-INHIBITOR ADDITIVES AND VISCOSITY MODIFYING ADDITIVES | ||
Former [1993/32] | FLUIDE FONCTIONNEL COMPORTANT DES TRIGLYCERIDES, DES ADDITIFS INHIBITEURS DE DETERGENTS ET DES ADDITIFS DE MODIFICATION DE LA VISCOSITE | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.02.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01101091.5 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 20.02.2001 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2001 | BE | 05.12.2001 | CH | 05.12.2001 | FR | 05.12.2001 | GR | 05.12.2001 | IT | 05.12.2001 | LI | 05.12.2001 | NL | 05.12.2001 | DK | 05.03.2002 | SE | 05.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | LU | 22.07.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FR | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
LU | 22.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
LU | 22.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 05.12.2001 | |
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 05.12.2001 | |
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 05.12.2001 | |
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/25] | SE | 05.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP62236896 ; | [A]US2851421 (ALLAN MANTEUFFEL, et al); | [X]GB2134923 (KASVIOLJY VAXTOLJE AB OY); | [A]WO8603221 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [A]WO8803552 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [A]WO8804313 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [A]WO8804684 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [A]WO8805808 (RAISION TEHTAAT OY AB [FI]); | [A]WO8805810 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [A]WO8909811 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [A]WO9007565 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [A]WO9102784 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]EP0310366 (ETHYL CORP [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 110 (C-486)8 April 1988 & JP,A,62 236 896 ( NIPPON PARKERIZING CO. ) 16 October 1987, & JP62236896 A 19871016 |