EP0599892 - CYCLOHEXENONE OXIMETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISSLITZ, Ulf Am Herzel 40 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
MEYER, Norbert Dossenheimer Weg 22 D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | 03 /
KAST, Juergen Kastanienstrasse24 D-6737 Boehl-Iggelheim / DE | 04 /
BRATZ, Matthias Schwabsgasse 2 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 05 /
HARREUS, Albrecht Teichgasse 13 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
WALTER, Helmut Gruenstadter Strasse 82 D-6719 Obrigheim / DE | 07 /
WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto Mausbergweg 58 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 08 /
GERBER, Matthias Ritterstrasse 3 D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | [1995/47] |
Former [1994/23] | 01 /
MISSLITZ, Ulf Am Herzel 40 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | ||
02 /
MEYER, Norbert Dossenheimer Weg 22 D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | |||
03 /
KAST, Juergen Kastanienstra e 24 D-6737 Boehl-Iggelheim / DE | |||
04 /
BRATZ, Matthias Schwabsgasse 2 D-6720 Speyer / DE | |||
05 /
HARREUS, Albrecht Teichgasse 13 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
06 /
WALTER, Helmut Gruenstadter Stra e 82 D-6719 Obrigheim / DE | |||
07 /
WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto Mausbergweg 58 D-6720 Speyer / DE | |||
08 /
GERBER, Matthias Ritterstra e 3 D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92916831.8 | 05.08.1992 | [1994/23] | WO1992EP01774 | Priority number, date | DE19914126479 | 09.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4126479 | [1994/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9303010 | Date: | 18.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599892 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599892 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/47, A01N35/10, A01N31/06, C07D261/08, C07D333/16, C07D333/28, A01N43/10, A01N43/80 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
C07D333/28 (EP);
A01N35/10 (EP);
A01N39/00 (EP);
C07C317/30 (EP);
C07C323/47 (EP);
C07D333/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/47] |
Former [1994/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | CYCLOHEXENONOXIMETHER | [1994/23] | English: | CYCLOHEXENONE OXIMETHERS | [1994/23] | French: | OXIMETHERS DE CYCLOHEXENONE | [1994/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 12.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 22.11.1995 | AT | 05.08.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/02] | AT | 05.08.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2125042 (CHEVRON RES); | [A]EP0177913 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0243313 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X]EP0368227 (BASF AG [DE]) |