EP0604458 - NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES OF GALACTINOL SYNTHASE FROM ZUCCHINI AND SOYBEAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Change - oral proceedings | 09.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERR, Phillip, S. 6 Woodsong Circle Newark, DE 19711 / US | 02 /
PEARLSTEIN, Richard, W. 12 Canoe Court Newark, DE 19702 / US | 03 /
SCHWEIGER, Bruce, J. 1412 North Union Street Wilmington, DE 19806 / US | 04 /
BECKER-MANLEY, Mary, F. 6380 Southwest 144th Street Miami, FL 33158 / US | 05 /
PIERCE, John, W. 302 Jackson Boulevard Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1994/27] | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92917170.0 | 24.07.1992 | [1994/27] | WO1992US06057 | Priority number, date | US19910735066 | 24.07.1991 Original published format: US 735066 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302196 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604458 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N15/82, C12N15/11, C12N5/10, A01H5/00, C12N1/21, C12Q1/68, C12P19/18 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
C12N15/8246 (EP,US);
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
C12Y204/01123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1994/27] | Title | German: | NUKLEOTID SEQUENZEN DER GALACTINOL SYNTHASE AUS ZUCCHETTI UND SOJABOHNE | [1994/27] | English: | NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES OF GALACTINOL SYNTHASE FROM ZUCCHINI AND SOYBEAN | [1994/27] | French: | SEQUENCES DE NUCLEOTIDES DE SYNTHASE DE GALACTINOL DE ZUCCHINI ET DE SOJA | [1994/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0368506 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]WO8912386 (CALGENE INC [US]) | [ ] - PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, vol. 96, no. 3, July 1991, Rockville, MD (US); P.T. SMITH et al., pp. 693-698 | [X] - PLANT PHYSIOLOGY. vol. 96, no. 3, July 1991, ROCKVILLE, MD, USA. pages 693 - 698 SMITH, P.T., ET AL. 'Purification and characterization of galactinol synthase from mature zucchini squash leaves' | [ ] - PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, vol. 96, no. 1, May 1991, Rockville, MD (US); P.T. SMITH et al., p. 9, AN 43; and D.U. BEEBE et al., p. 100, AN 626 | [X] - PLANT PHYSIOLOGY. vol. 96, no. 1, May 1991, ROCKVILLE, MD, USA. page 9 SMITH, P.T., ET AL. 'Purification and characterization of zucchini galactinol synthase' | [ ] - MOLECULAR CLONING, A LABORATORY MANUAL, 2nd ed., 1990; SAMBROOK et al., pp. 12.10-12.28 | [Y] - PLANT PHYSIOLOGY. vol. 96, no. 1, May 1991, ROCKVILLE, MD, USA. page 100 BEEBE, D.U., ET AL. 'Galactinol synthase is sequestered in intermediary cells (companion cells) of Cucurbita leaf phloem' | [Y] - MOLECULAR CLONING: A LABORATORY MANUAL. SECOND EDITION 1990, pages 12.10 - 12.28 SAMBROOK, ET AL. 'Screening expression libraries with antibodies and oligonucleotides' | [A] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 83 , 1987, Philadelphia, PA, US; abstract no. 101203, SARAVITZ, D.M., ET AL. 'Galactinol synthase activity and soluble sugars in developing seeds of four soybean genotypes' cited in the application | [A] - J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM. vol. 38, no. 2, February 1990, pages 351 - 355 CASTILLO, E.M., ET AL. 'Raffinose synthase and galactinol synthase in developing seeds and leaves of legumes' | [A] - THE PLANT CELL. vol. 3, no. 3, March 1991, ROCKVILLE, MD, USA. pages 213 - 218 DILWORTH. M.F. 'Molecular biology comes home' |