EP0587811 - MODULAR ELEMENT FOR MOUNTING WITH OTHER IDENTICAL OR SIMILAR ELEMENTS TO FORM A STORE ASSEMBLY, AND MODULAR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.06.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUSCHLE, Richard Dieter Rua Sacopa 109/901 Lagoa 22471 Rio de Janeiro / BR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states BUSCHLE, Richard, Dieter Rua Sacopa no. 109/901 22471-Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Bardo, Julian Eason, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Bardo, Julian Eason, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92917329.2 | 05.06.1992 | [1994/12] | WO1992BR00008 | Priority number, date | BR19919102329 | 05.06.1991 Original published format: BR 9102329 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222061 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587811 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/02, G11B23/023, G11B33/04 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
G11B23/0236 (EP);
G11B33/0483 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | Modulelement zur Montierung mit anderen identischen oder ähnlichen Elementen zur Formung einer Speicheranordnung und Modulanordnung | [1994/12] | English: | MODULAR ELEMENT FOR MOUNTING WITH OTHER IDENTICAL OR SIMILAR ELEMENTS TO FORM A STORE ASSEMBLY, AND MODULAR ASSEMBLY | [1994/12] | French: | ELEMENT MODULAIRE SE MONTANT AVEC D'AUTRES ELEMENTS IDENTIQUES POUR CONSTITUER UN ENSEMBLE DE RANGEMENT MODULAIRE | [1994/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 22.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 12.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/33] | 01.04.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9104558 ; | [X]EP0086275 ; | [A]EP0051856 |