EP0598014 - Use of atelocollagen as a solid binding substrate for a specific sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/21] | USE OF COLLAGEN AS A SOLID BINDING SUBSTRATE FOR A SPECIFIC SENSOR | ||
[1995/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLETICA 32, rue Saint Jean de Dieu 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states COLETICA 32, rue Saint Jean de Dieu F-69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOURCART, Jean Place de l'Orme Baslieux Les Fimes F-51170 Fimes / FR | 02 /
BUFFEVANT, Chantal Les Carres Millery F-69390 Vernaison / FR | 03 /
HUC, Alain 26, chemin des Santons F-69110 Ste-Foy-Les-Lyon / FR | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92917551.1 | 30.07.1992 | [1994/21] | WO1992FR00749 | Priority number, date | FR19910009819 | 01.08.1991 Original published format: FR 9109819 | [1994/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9303373 | Date: | 18.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598014 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598014 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/544, G01N33/546, G01N33/569, G01N33/76 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
G01N33/544 (EP);
G01N33/5432 (EP);
G01N33/54326 (EP);
G01N33/548 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/21] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Atelokollagen als Festträger für die Fixierung eines spezifischen Fängers | [1995/38] | English: | Use of atelocollagen as a solid binding substrate for a specific sensor | [1995/38] | French: | Utilisation d'atélocollagène comme support solide de fixation d'un capteur spécifique | [1995/38] |
Former [1994/21] | Verwendung von Kollagen als Festträger für die Fixierung eines spezifischen Fängers | ||
Former [1994/21] | USE OF COLLAGEN AS A SOLID BINDING SUBSTRATE FOR A SPECIFIC SENSOR | ||
Former [1994/21] | UTILISATION DE COLLAGENE COMME SUPPORT SOLIDE DE FIXATION D'UN CAPTEUR SPECIFIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.1995 | DK | 20.09.1995 | ES | 20.09.1995 | GR | 20.09.1995 | MC | 20.09.1995 | NL | 20.09.1995 | SE | 20.12.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 20.09.1995 | |
DK | 20.09.1995 | ||
ES | 20.09.1995 | ||
GR | 20.09.1995 | ||
MC | 20.09.1995 | ||
SE | 20.12.1995 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 20.09.1995 | |
DK | 20.09.1995 | ||
GR | 20.09.1995 | ||
MC | 20.09.1995 | ||
SE | 20.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 20.09.1995 | |
DK | 20.09.1995 | ||
GR | 20.09.1995 | ||
SE | 20.12.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 20.09.1995 | |
DK | 20.09.1995 | ||
SE | 20.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 20.09.1995 | |
SE | 20.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 20.12.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0023607 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]); | [X]WO8303102 (MOSBACH KLAUS, et al); | [Y]FR2642329 (BIOETICA SA [FR]); | DE4037724 [ ] (PRINCETON BIOMEDITECH CORP [US], et al); | [A]EP0439222 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | Examination | US4169804 |