EP0656072 - BINDER COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR AGGLOMERATING PARTICULATE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2000/11] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITT, James 1300 Golf Course Road Eveleth, MN 55734 / US | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1995/23] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department P.O. 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 92917701.2 | 06.08.1992 | [1995/23] | WO1992US06551 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9403648 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656072 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656072 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.02.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/244, C22B1/243 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
C22B1/243 (EP);
C22B1/244 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/23] | C22B1/244 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/23] | Title | German: | BINDERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND -VERFAHREN ZUM AGGLOMERIEREN TEILCHENFORMIGEN MATERIALS | [1999/33] | English: | BINDER COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR AGGLOMERATING PARTICULATE MATERIAL | [1995/23] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LIANT ET PROCEDE D'AGGLOMERATION DE MATIERE PARTICULAIRE | [1995/23] |
Former [1995/23] | BILDERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND -VERFAHREN ZUM AGGLOMERIEREN TEILCHENFORMIGEN MATERIALS | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1995 | Search fee paid | 23.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 22.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.03.2000 | GR | 15.03.2000 | LI | 15.03.2000 | DK | 15.06.2000 | MC | 31.08.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | CH | 15.03.2000 | |
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
DK | 15.06.2000 | ||
MC | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | CH | 15.03.2000 | |
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
MC | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 15.03.2000 | |
LI | 15.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US825440 (WOODMANSEE WESLEY G [US]) [Y] 1-5,16 * page 1, column R, line 68 - line 70; claim - *; | [AD]US4288245 (ROORDA HERM J, et al) [AD] 6,7,15,22,23,25 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]US4751259 (ROE WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]EP0297553 (AQUALON CO [US]); | [D]US4863512 (BANYAI BRUCE E [US], et al); | [AD]EP0376713 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]) [AD] 7,12,15,25 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]US4948430 (BANYAI BRUCE E [US], et al) [AD] 7,12 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0427602 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [X] 1,16 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9205290 (ORIOX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 7,12,15,25 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5112582 (POLIZZOTTI DAVID M [US]) [X] 1,16 * claim - *; | [EA]EP0541181 (AKZO NV [NL]) [E] 1-5,16 * example -; claim - * [A] 8,10,11,17-21,25; | [A] - DE SOUZA ET AL., "Production of Acid Iron Ore Pellet for Direct Reduction, Using an Organic Binder", MINING ENGINEERING, (198410), pages 1437 - 1441, XP002001468 [A] 1,8,16,23 * page 1437, column L, line 1 - page 1441, column L, line 4 * | International search | [A]US2862809 (THRELKELD DONALD D); | [A]US2914394 (HEINRICH DOHMEN); | [A]US3644113 (LANG WILLIAM J, et al); | [A]US3852059 (SMALLEY E, et al); | [A]US4440575 (DAUSSAN JEAN-CHARLES [FR], et al); | [Y]US4863512 (BANYAI BRUCE E [US], et al); | [A]US5112391 (OWEN DAVID O [US], et al) |