EP0598815 - AN ARTICULATING DEVICE WITH AUTOMATIC ADAPTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEDERICI, Edmondo Via G. Ciaralli, 26 I-00156 Roma / IT | [1994/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Mascioli, Alessandro, et al c/o A.N.D.I. Associazione Nazionale degli Inventori Via Urbana, 20 00184 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Mascioli, Alessandro, Prof.Dr., et al c/o A.N.D.I. Associazione Nazionale degli Inventori Via Urbana, 20 I-00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 92917856.4 | 20.07.1992 | [1994/22] | WO1992IT00084 | Priority number, date | IT1992RM00460 | 17.06.1992 Original published format: IT RM920460 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9325160 | Date: | 23.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598815 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598815 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61C11/00 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
A61C11/022 (EP,US);
A61C11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1994/30] |
Former [1994/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | ARTIKULATOR MIT AUTOMATISCHER ANPASSUNG | [1994/22] | English: | AN ARTICULATING DEVICE WITH AUTOMATIC ADAPTATION | [1994/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ARTICULATION A ADAPTATION AUTOMATIQUE | [1994/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.12.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   22.12.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.1998 | CH | 06.05.1998 | FR | 06.05.1998 | LI | 06.05.1998 | GB | 06.08.1998 | SE | 06.08.1998 | DE | 07.08.1998 | [2004/35] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
CH | 06.05.1998 | ||
LI | 06.05.1998 | ||
GB | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
DE | 07.08.1998 | ||
FR | 02.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
GB | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
DE | 07.08.1998 | ||
CH | 11.08.1998 | ||
LI | 11.08.1998 | ||
FR | 02.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
GB | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
DE | 07.08.1998 | ||
FR | 02.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
DE | 07.08.1998 | ||
FR | 02.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
DE | 07.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 06.08.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4443191 (GUTIERREZ ANTONIO M [CU]); | [A]DE8906103U ; | [A]DE3918497 (ZEISER MANFRED P [DE]); | [A]US5073109 (EL HADARY KHALED A H [EG]) | by applicant | US4443191 |