EP0597031 - STONE EXPULSION STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 300 Lakeside Drive 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHAN, Cu, Ngoc 2048, 14th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 02 /
STOLLER, Marshall, L. 50 Lopez Street San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/20] | Orès, Bernard Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92917858.0 | 24.07.1992 | [1994/20] | WO1992US06174 | Priority number, date | US19910736187 | 26.07.1991 Original published format: US 736187 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302721 | Date: | 18.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597031 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597031 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.02.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61M25/00, A61B17/22, A61F2/06 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
A61F2/94 (EP,US);
A61B17/22031 (EP,US);
A61M25/04 (EP,US);
A61M27/008 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22034 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0093 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1075 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1078 (EP,US);
A61M25/0021 (EP,US);
A61M25/0043 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/20] | A61M1/00, A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | DILATATOR ZUM ENTFERNEN VON STEINEN | [1994/20] | English: | STONE EXPULSION STENT | [1994/20] | French: | EXTENSEUR SERVANT A L'EXPULSION DE CALCULS | [1994/20] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.1994 | Search fee paid | 31.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 09.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0473790 (IMAGE MAKER LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2,5* column 5, paragraph L - column 6, paragraph 2; figures 6,7 * | International search | [A]US2756752 (IRVING SCHERLIS); | [A]US4030503 (CLARK III WILLIAM T); | [A]US4295464 (SHIHATA ALFRED A); | [A]US4790812 (HAWKINS JR IRVIN F [US], et al); | [A]US5011489 (SALEM MOHAMED E M [EG]) |