EP0596036 - TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950 Palo Alto California 94303-0802 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states ALZA CORPORATION 950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950 Palo Alto California 94303-0802 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAK, Ronald, P. 15196 Dickens Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 02 /
THEEUWES, Felix 27350 Altamont Road Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
GYORY, J., Richard 1388 Bouret Drive San Jose, CA 95118 / US | [1995/28] |
Former [1994/26] | 01 /
HAAK, Ronald, P. 15196 Dickens Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | ||
02 /
THEEUWES, Felix 27350 altamont Road Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | |||
03 /
GYORY, J., Richard 1388 Bouret Drive San Jose, CA 95118 / US | |||
Former [1994/19] | 01 /
HAAK, Ronald, P. 15196 Dickens Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | ||
02 /
THEEUWES, Felix 1634 Fallen Leaf Lane Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
03 /
GYORY, J., Richard 1388 Bouret Drive San Jose, CA 95118 / US | Representative(s) | Evans, David Charles 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [1994/19] | Application number, filing date | 92917863.0 | 22.07.1992 | [1994/19] | WO1992US06151 | Priority number, date | US19910735126 | 24.07.1991 Original published format: US 735126 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301807 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596036 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596036 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K9/00 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
A61N1/0448 (EP,US);
A61K9/0009 (EP,US);
A61N1/0436 (EP,US);
A61N1/044 (EP,US);
A61N1/0444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | TRANSDERMALE ABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [1994/19] | English: | TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY DEVICE | [1994/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ADMINISTRATION TRANSCUTANEE | [1994/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4640689 (SIBALIS DAN [US]) |