EP0604466 - PROCESS FOR COMPENSATING A MAGNETIC INTERFERENCE FIELD IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREHLER, Markus Wackersberger Str. 33 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 02 /
FEIGEN, Patrick Liesl-Karlstadt-Str. 19 D-8000 München 71 / DE | [1994/27] | Application number, filing date | 92918130.3 | 27.08.1992 | [1994/27] | WO1992EP01981 | Priority number, date | EP19910115776 | 17.09.1991 Original published format: EP 91115776 | [1994/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306434 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604466 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0604466 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01C17/38, G01R33/025 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
G01R33/025 (EP,US);
G01C17/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION EINES MAGNETISCHEN STÖRFELDES IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [1994/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR COMPENSATING A MAGNETIC INTERFERENCE FIELD IN A VEHICLE | [1994/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMPENSATION D'UN CHAMP MAGNETIQUE PERTURBATEUR DANS UN VEHICULE | [1994/27] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/47: Teilanmeldung 95102680.6 eingereicht am 27/08/92 | EPB 1995/47: Divisional application 95102680.6 filed on 27/08/92 | EPB 1995/47: Demande divisionnaire 95102680.6 déposée le 27/08/92 | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95102680.6 / EP0657746 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4622843 (HORMEL RONALD F [US]); | [A]US4807462 (AL-ATTAR RAFI [US]); | [Y]DE4000345 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0382290 (MAGNAVOX CO [US]); | [XP]EP0451839 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |