EP0599973 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF BETA-PHENYLISOSERINE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.09.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron F-92160 Antony / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENIS, Jean-Noel Gites de Belledonne Apt. no 3 Le Pinet F-38410 Uriage / FR | 02 /
GREENE, Andrew La Maison du Verger Saint Martin d'Uriage F-38410 Uriage / FR | 03 /
KANAZAWA, Alice 97 Cours Berriat F-38000 Grenoble / FR | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Pilard, Jacques, et al RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A. 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Pilard, Jacques, et al RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A. 20 Avenue Raymond Aron F-92165 Antony Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92918283.0 | 17.08.1992 | [1994/23] | WO1992FR00795 | Priority number, date | FR19910010398 | 19.08.1991 Original published format: FR 9110398 | [1994/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304038 | Date: | 04.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599973 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C269/06, C07C231/12, C07D305/14, C07C233/83, C07C271/22 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
C07C231/12 (EP);
C07C269/06 (EP);
C07D305/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] |
Former [1994/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BETA-PHENYLSOSERIN DERIVATEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [1994/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF BETA-PHENYLISOSERINE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF | [1994/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DERIVES DE LA $g(b)-PHENYLISOSERINE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1994/23] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/52: Verbunden mit 92402293.2/0528729 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 10.11.94 | EPB 1994/52: Consolidated with 92402293.2/0528729 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 10.11.94 | EPB 1994/52: Jointe à la demande no. 92402293.2/0528729 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 10.11.94 | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/47] | 03.07.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0336840 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]); | [A]EP0336841 (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]); | [XP]WO9117977 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]); | [XP]WO9117976 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) |