EP0599990 - HLA TYPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANGSTAT MEDICAL CORPORATION 1505B Adams Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [1994/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POULETTY, Philippe 3 Odell Place Atherton, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
CHUN, Peter 3761 Redburn Street South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Chin, Hai 1110 Runnymead Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | O'Brien, Caroline Jane, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | O'Brien, Caroline Jane, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92918534.6 | 12.08.1992 | [1994/23] | WO1992US06787 | Priority number, date | US19910745163 | 15.08.1991 Original published format: US 745163 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304372 | Date: | 04.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599990 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599990 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/577, G01N33/569 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/56977 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/23] | G01N33/543, G01N33/577 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/23] | Title | German: | HLA-TYPISIERUNG VON HUMANEN LEUKOZYTEN | [1994/23] | English: | HLA TYPING | [1994/23] | French: | TYPAGE D'ANTIGENES DE LEUCOCYTES HUMAINS (ALH) | [1994/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 04.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 06.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] | Request for further processing for: | 06.06.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]WO9221030 (SANGSTAT MEDICAL CORPORATION) [T] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [T] - P. POULETTY ET AL., "Typing of serum-soluble HLA-B27 antigen by ELISA.", TISSUE ANTIGENS, COPENHAGEN DK, (1993), vol. 42, pages 14 - 19, XP000569123 [T] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO8705398 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU]); | [Y]US4937199 (GRIFFITHS PAUL D [GB], et al); | [Y]US4895706 (ROOT DAVID [US], et al); | [PXY]US5098827 (BOYLE MICHAEL D P [US], et al) | [Y] - Human Immunology, Vol. 21, issued 1988, K. SAKAGUCHI et al., "Anti-HLA-B7,B27,Bw42,Bw54,Bw55,Bw56,Bw67,B w73monoclonalantibodies; Specificity, idiotypes, and application for a double determinant immunoassay", pages 193-207, see Figures 4-5 and Tables 6-7. | Examination | - Russo et al, Human Immunology vol. 19, 1987, p. 69 - 77 | by applicant | WO9221030 | WO8705398 | US4937199 | - SAKAGUCHI, HUMAN IMMUNOLOCRY, (1988), vol. 21, pages 193 - 207 | - VILLAR ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 19, pages 1835 - 39 | - GROSSE-WILDE, VOX SANG, (1989), vol. 56, pages 196 - 99 | - FERREIRA, CLIN. CHIM. ACTA., (1988), vol. 174, pages 207 - 11 |