EP0601040 - HOODED TRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSIDOMÄN PACKAGING SYSTEMS LIMITED Woodward Avenue Yate, Bristol BS17 5YS / GB | [1997/09] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states ASSIDOMÄN PACKAGING SYSTEMS LIMITED Avon Street Bristol BS2 0PU / GB | ||
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states ASSI PACKAGING SYSTEMS LIMITED Avon Street Bristol BS2 0PU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INMAN, Michael, Anthony Assi Packaging Systems Limited Avon Street Bristol BS2 0PU / GB | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 92918633.6 | 03.09.1992 | [1994/24] | WO1992GB01611 | Priority number, date | GB19910018805 | 03.09.1991 Original published format: GB 9118805 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304932 | Date: | 18.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601040 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601040 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/32, B65D5/52 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
B65D5/32 (EP,US);
B65D5/325 (EP,US);
B65D5/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/24] | Title | German: | STEIGE MIT STÜLPDECKEL | [1994/24] | English: | HOODED TRAY | [1994/24] | French: | PLATEAU A COUVERCLE | [1994/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.11.1996 | ES | 13.11.1996 | GR | 13.11.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
GR | 13.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 13.11.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1190156 ; | [X]FR2063582 (BEGHIN); | [Y]GB2206563 (REED PACKAGING LTD) |