EP0600037 - TIRE PRESSURING AND REGULATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYCLOID COMPANY 800 Vinial Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212 / US | [1994/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENIER, Grant, J. 4179 Rothschild Court Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Moore, Derek, et al Jensen & Son 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Moore, Derek, et al Jensen & Son 70 Paul Street London EC2A 4NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92919475.1 | 27.08.1992 | [1994/23] | WO1992US07296 | Priority number, date | US19910750606 | 27.08.1991 Original published format: US 750606 | US19920891410 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: US 891410 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9303936 | Date: | 04.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600037 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0600037 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/00 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
B60C23/131 (EP,US);
B60C23/137 (EP,US);
B60C23/133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | PUMPEINRICHTUNG ZUR EINHALTUNG DES REIFENDRUCKS | [1996/21] | English: | TIRE PRESSURING AND REGULATING APPARATUS | [1994/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE GONFLAGE SOUS PRESSION D'UN PNEU ET DE REGULATION DE LA PRESSION | [1994/23] |
Former [1994/23] | REIFENDRUCKPUMP- UND ÜBERWACHUNGSEINRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 18.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.1996 | BE | 22.05.1996 | ES | 22.05.1996 | FR | 22.05.1996 | GR | 22.05.1996 | IT | 22.05.1996 | SE | 22.08.1996 | DE | 23.08.1996 | GB | 27.08.1996 | IE | 27.08.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
ES | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
DE | 23.08.1996 | ||
GB | 27.08.1996 | ||
IE | 27.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [2001/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
DE | 23.08.1996 | ||
GB | 27.08.1996 | ||
IE | 27.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
DE | 23.08.1996 | ||
GB | 27.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
DE | 23.08.1996 | ||
GB | 27.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/30] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
DE | 23.08.1996 | ||
GB | 27.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
DE | 23.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
DE | 23.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
DE | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 22.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2008E (OCEDES LAVANCHY-MAISON) [FR]) [Y] 1-8,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2055983 (PEO RALPH F) [Y] 1-8,11 * column W *; | [X]DE2813601 (INNOVA GES ZUR INNOVATIONSFOER) [X] 12-15,20,26-28* page 5, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph L; figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US1679505 (ANNIE E STEWART); | [A]US1887715 (HESTER EDGAR A); | [A]US1930041 (CROWLEY JOHN C, et al); | [A]GB429262 (ERNEST CHARLES HAYWOOD) |