EP0604530 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A LIQUID AND ANOTHER FREE-FLOWING MEDIUM THROUGH THE SAME PIPE LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1995 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PITZEL, Dirk Spazzostrasse 4 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states PITZEL, Dirk Spazzostrasse 4 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/01] |
Former [1994/27] | Sandmann, Joachim, Dr. Hirtenstrasse 19 D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Application number, filing date | 92920045.9 | 17.09.1992 | [1994/27] | WO1992EP02145 | Priority number, date | DE19914131208 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4131208 | [1994/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306409 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604530 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/128, F17D3/08 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
F17D3/08 (EP);
F16L55/1283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT UND EINES ANDEREN FLIE FÄHIGEN MEDIUMS DURCH DIESELBE FÖRDERLEITUNG | [1994/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A LIQUID AND ANOTHER FREE-FLOWING MEDIUM THROUGH THE SAME PIPE LINE | [1994/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRANSPORT D'UN LIQUIDE ET D'UN AUTRE PRODUIT COULANT PAR LA MEME CONDUITE DE TRANSPORT | [1994/27] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 31.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/43] | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3676091 (FRASER JOHN P, et al); | [A]US3695301 (PITTMAN FORREST C); | [A]EP0082895 (BRISTER INC [US]); | [AP]FR2664359 (CHALLENGER SPECIAL OIL SERVICE [FR]) |