EP0658093 - PROCESS AND KIT FOR DYEING HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROTA, Guiseppe Via Giacchimo Toma, 6 I-80127 Naples / IT | 02 /
WOLFRAM, Leszek J. 666 Westover Road Stamford, CT 06902 / US | 03 /
WENKE, Gottfried 6 Cow Path Lane Woodbridge, CT 06902 / US | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1995/25] | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92920189.5 | 17.09.1992 | [1995/25] | WO1992US07880 | Priority number, date | US19910766606 | 26.09.1991 Original published format: US 766606 | US19920909371 | 13.07.1992 Original published format: US 909371 | US19920923078 | 31.07.1992 Original published format: US 923078 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9305759 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658093 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658093 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM FÄRBEN DER HAARE | [1995/25] | English: | PROCESS AND KIT FOR DYEING HAIR | [1995/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET KIT SERVANT A LA TEINTURE DES CHEVEUX | [1995/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 25.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.03.1994 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2000 | BE | 07.06.2000 | CH | 07.06.2000 | ES | 07.06.2000 | GR | 07.06.2000 | LI | 07.06.2000 | NL | 07.06.2000 | DK | 07.09.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 07.06.2000 | |
BE | 07.06.2000 | ||
CH | 07.06.2000 | ||
ES | 07.06.2000 | ||
LI | 07.06.2000 | ||
NL | 07.06.2000 | ||
DK | 07.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 07.06.2000 | |
BE | 07.06.2000 | ||
CH | 07.06.2000 | ||
ES | 07.06.2000 | ||
LI | 07.06.2000 | ||
NL | 07.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 07.06.2000 | |
BE | 07.06.2000 | ||
CH | 07.06.2000 | ||
ES | 07.06.2000 | ||
LI | 07.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 07.06.2000 | |
BE | 07.06.2000 | ||
CH | 07.06.2000 | ||
LI | 07.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 07.06.2000 | |
BE | 07.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US3993436 (FUJINUMA YOSHIMORI); | [Y]US4776857 (CARROLL JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]US4904274 (SCHULTZ THOMAS M [US], et al) |