EP0559912 - METHOD OF LASER PROCESSING AND SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATA, Yoshinori Fanuc Manshonharimomi Room 4-206 3536, Shibokusa, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake & Co Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92920377.6 | 25.09.1992 | [1993/37] | WO1992JP01224 | Priority number, date | JP19910274999 | 27.09.1991 Original published format: JP 27499991 | [1993/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9305922 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0559912 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0559912 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/08, B23K26/06 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B23K26/0892 (EP,US);
B23K26/08 (KR);
B23K26/04 (EP,US);
B23K26/06 (EP,US);
B23K26/064 (EP,US);
B23K26/0643 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/37] | B23K26/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1993/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LASERBEARBEITEN | [1993/37] | English: | METHOD OF LASER PROCESSING AND SYSTEM THEREFOR | [1993/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT AU LASER ET SYSTEME PREVU A CET EFFET | [1993/37] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1993 | Translation filed | 22.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 22.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.12.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 11.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0373055 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 23 - column 9, line 54; figures 1,5 * | International search | [XY]JPH03189090 (KOIKE SANSO KOGYO KK); | [Y]JPH01501851 |