EP0607214 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE HAVING A SPEAKER AND MICROPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1994/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAWLISH, Joy, N. 585 Riley Lane Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | 02 /
COHODES, Suzanne, Y. 717 North Evergreen Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1994/30] | Hudson, Peter David MOTOROLA European Intellectual Property Operations Jays Close Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke Hants RG22 4PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92920742.1 | 28.09.1992 | [1994/30] | WO1992US08237 | Priority number, date | US19910772989 | 08.10.1991 Original published format: US 772989 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9307680 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607214 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607214 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
H04M1/6041 (EP,US);
H04M1/0214 (EP,US);
H04M1/0245 (EP,US);
H04M1/605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/30] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT LAUTSPRECHER UND MIKROFON | [1994/30] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE HAVING A SPEAKER AND MICROPHONE | [1994/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION COMPORTANT UN HAUT-PARLEUR ET UN MICROPHONE | [1994/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 31.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 31.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4845772 (METROKA MICHAEL P [US], et al) [Y] 7,10 * column 3, line 1 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0331435 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 7,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - line 54; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0389676 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * column 5, line 19 - line 35; figure 9 *; | [A]EP0399176 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9107836 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [XY]EP0445808 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - line 41; figures 13,14 * [Y] 3,4 | International search | [A]US2952739 (LEHMAN FRANCIS H); | [A]US3659050 (CARLSSON ANDERS KJELL JOHAN, et al); | [A]US3800089 (REDDICK W); | [A]US4178488 (NISHIHATA YUKIHIRO [JP]); | [X]US4647722 (NISHIDA KOUJI [JP], et al); | [X]GB2215163 (CONNOR RONALD GEORGE, et al); | [A]US4882745 (SILVER ALAN H [US]) |